Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2511 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/21/2021

                     
 
Req. No. 7019 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
HOUSE BILL 2511 	By: Kannady 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to tobacco and vapor products; 
requiring retailers to verify purchasers ' age through 
certain means; requiring vapor prod uct manufacturers 
to make a certain attestation and certification to 
the Alcoholic Beverage Law s Enforcement Commission; 
providing for contents of the attestation; requiring 
notification of material changes to the attestation; 
requiring the ABLE Commission to develop, publish, 
and maintain a certain directory; prohibiting certain 
acts; providing for codification; and providing an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A ne w section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 1 -229.35 of Title 63, unless 
there is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
Before selling a tobacco product or vapor product to a 
purchaser, a retailer shall verify that t he purchaser is at least 
twenty-one (21) years of age by examining a government -issued 
photographic identification and performing age verification through 
enhanced controls that utilize a scanning technology or other 
automated, software-based system.   
 
Req. No. 7019 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 2.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 1 -229.36 of Title 63, unless 
there is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  Beginning July 1, 2022, every manufacturer of a va por 
product that is sold or intended to be sold in this state, whether 
directly or through a distributor, retailer, or similar intermediary 
or intermediaries, shall execute and deliver an attestation under 
the penalty of perjury to the Oklahoma Alcoholic B everage Laws 
Enforcement (ABLE) Commission certifying that, as of the date of 
such attestation: 
1.  The vapor product was available for purchase in the United 
States as of August 8, 2016, and the manufacturer has applied for a 
marketing order for the vapor product by submitting a Premarket 
Tobacco Product Application on or before September 9, 2020 , to the 
United States Food and Drug Administration (FDA); or 
2.  The manufacturer has received a marketing order or other 
authorization for the vapor product from the FDA pursuant to Section 
387j of Title 21 of the United States C ode. 
B.  The manufacturer shall notify the ABLE Commission within 
thirty (30) days of any material change to the attestation, 
including whether the FDA has issued or not issued a market or der or 
other authorization, or has ordered the manufacturer to remove the 
vapor product, either temporarily or permanently, from the United 
States market.   
 
Req. No. 7019 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
C.  The ABLE Commission shall develop a directory listing all of 
the manufacturers that have provided attestations that comply with 
subsection A of this section and all vapor products that are li sted 
in such certifications.  The ABLE Commission: 
1.  Shall make the directory available for public inspection on 
its website on or before October 1, 2022 ; and 
2.  Shall update the directory as necessary to correct mistakes 
and to add or remove manufacturers or vapor products to maintain the 
directory in conformity with the requirements of this section. 
D.  It shall be unlawful for any person, directly or indirect ly, 
to knowingly manufacture, distribute, sell, barter , or furnish in 
this state any vapor product that is not included in the directory. 
SECTION 3.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
 
58-1-7019 AB 01/08/21