Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2905 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/18/2021

                     
 
HB2905 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
HOUSE BILL NO. 2905 	By: Wallace and Hilbert of the 
House 
 
   and 
 
  Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to the Office of Juvenile Affairs; 
requiring that certain appropriated funds be used for 
certain purpose; requiring certain funds be used to 
supplement and not replace existing funding; 
providing for lapse of funds under certain 
conditions; requiring certain budget procedures; and 
prohibiting certain budget procedures. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.  From the funds appropriated to the Office of 
Juvenile Affairs in Enrolled House Bill N o. 2900 of the 1st Session 
of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of One Million Five 
Hundred Thousand Dollars ($1,500,000.00) shall be used to increase 
the funding of the Community Based Youth Services Division of the 
Office of Juvenile Affairs above t he actual expenditure levels for   
 
HB2905 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2021.  This funding shall be used to 
supplement rather than replace existing funding. 
SECTION 2.  Appropriations made by Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 
of the 1st Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, not including 
appropriations made for capital outlay purposes, may be budgeted for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022 (hereafter FY -22) or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY -23).  
Funds budgeted for FY-22 may be encumbered only through June 30, 
2022, and must be expended by November 15, 2022.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2022, and not budgeted for FY -23, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal 
year. Funds budgeted for FY -23 may be encumbered only through June 
30, 2023.  Any funds remaining after November 15, 2023, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.  
These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal y ears 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY -22, and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY -23, after 
the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work program revision removin g these funds 
from the FY-22 budget work program and after such revision has been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON JOINT COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS 
AND BUDGET, dated 05/17/2021 - DO PASS, As Amended.