An Act ENROLLED HOUSE BILL NO. 2905 By: Wallace, Hilbert and Conley of the House and Thompson and Hall of the Senate An Act relating to the Office of Juvenile Affairs; requiring that certain appropriated funds be used for certain purpose; requiring certain funds be used to supplement and not replace existing funding; providing for lapse of funds under certain conditions; requiring certain budget procedures; and prohibiting certain budget procedures. SUBJECT: Office of Juvenile Affairs BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. From the funds appropriated to the Office of Juvenile Affairs in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of One Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($1,500,000.00) shall be used to increase the funding of the Community Based Youth Services Division of the Office of Juvenile Affairs above the actual expenditure levels for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2021. This funding shall be use d to supplement rather than replace existing funding. SECTION 2. Appropriations made by Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, not including appropriations made for capital outlay purposes, may b e budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022 (hereafter FY -22) or may be budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY -23). Funds budgeted for FY -22 may be encumbered only through June 30, 2022, and must be expended by November 15 , 2022. Any funds remaining after November 15, 2022, and not budgeted for FY -23, shall ENR. H. B. NO. 2905 Page 2 lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year. Funds budgeted for FY -23 may be encumbered only through June 30, 2023. Any funds remaining af ter November 15, 2023, shall lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year. These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years simultaneously. Funds budgeted in FY -22, and not required to pay obligations for that fisc al year, may be budgeted for FY -23, after the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds from the FY-22 budget work program and after such revision has been approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. ENR. H. B. NO. 2905 Page 3 Passed the House of Representatives the 18th day of May, 2021. Presiding Officer of the House of Representatives Passed the Senate the 20th day of May, 2021. Presiding Officer of the Senate OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. By: _________________________________ Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this ____ _____ day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. _________________________________ Governor of the State of Oklahoma OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. By: _________________________________