Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3065 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/18/2022

                     
 
Req. No. 8578 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) 
 
HOUSE BILL 3065 	By: Manger  
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to public health and safety; amending 
63 O.S. 2021, Section 2 -103, which relates to the 
Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; 
authorizing commissioned employees to purchase 
certain firearms prior to retirement; providing 
purchasing requirements; providing for the transfer 
and modification of ownership records; directing 
proceeds be deposited into certain revolving fund; 
and providing an effec tive date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     63 O.S. 2021, Section 2 -103, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 2-103. A.  The Director shall be app ointed by the 
Oklahoma State Bureau of Narcotics and Dangerous Drugs Control 
Commission.  The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Narcotics 
and Dangerous Drugs Control on January 1, 1984, shall be initia lly 
appointed as Director.  The succeeding Direc tor shall, at the time 
of the appointment, have a Bachelor 's Degree from an accredited 
college or university and at least five (5) years of experience in 
drug law enforcement.  The Director may appoint necess ary   
 
Req. No. 8578 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
assistants, agents, an d other personnel to p erform the work of the 
office and may prescribe their titles and duties and fix their 
compensation pursuant to Merit Syste m rules.  The Director may 
appoint employees to the positions of Chief of Law Enforcem ent 
Information and Techno logy, Public Informati on/Education Officer, 
Training Officer, Program Administrators, Grants Administrator, 
Criminal Analysts, Legal Secretary, and Typist Clerk/Spanish 
Transcriptionists.  The positions shall be unclassified and e xempt 
from the rules and p rocedures of the Offic e of Management and 
Enterprise Services, except leave regulations.  The office of the 
Director shall be located at a suita ble place in Oklahoma City, 
Oklahoma. 
B.  1.  Agents appointed by the Director shall h ave the powers 
of peace officers generally; prov ided, the Director may appoint 
special agents and reserve special agents, who shall be unclassified 
employees of the state , to meet specific investigatory needs.  
Special agents and reserve special agents sha ll not be required to 
meet the age and education al requirements as specified in this 
section. 
2.  Agents appointed on and after November 1, 1998, shall be at 
least twenty-one (21) years of age and shall have a Bachelor 's 
Degree from an accredited college o r university.   
 
Req. No. 8578 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
3.  Each entering agent, with the exception of special agents, 
shall be required to serve one (1) year in a probationary status as 
a prerequisite to being p laced on permanent status. 
C.  Agents appointed pursuant to the provisions of this sec tion 
shall have the respon sibility of investigat ing alleged violations 
and shall have the authority to arrest those suspected of having 
violated the provisions of the Uni form Controlled Dangerous 
Substances Act, as well as the crimes of money laundering an d human 
trafficking, as otherwise set forth by l aws of this state. 
D.  The Director may appoint reserve special agents who shall 
not be considered employees of the state and shall serve at the will 
of the Director.  Reserve special agents shall complete a minimum of 
two hundred forty (240) hours of trai ning pursuant to Section 3311 
of Title 70 of the Oklahoma Statutes and may not serve more than one 
hundred forty (140) hou rs per calendar month.  Upon completion of 
training, reserve special agents appointed by the Director shall 
have general peace officer powers and the authority to arrest those 
suspected of having violated the provisions of the Uniform 
Controlled Dangerous Substances Act.  The agency may expend funds 
related to training and special reserve a gents may receive travel 
expenses pursuant to th e State Travel Reimbursement Act. 
E.  A commissioned employee of the Oklahoma State Bureau of 
Narcotics and Dangerous Drug s Control shall be entitled to receive, 
upon retirement by reason of length of service , the continued   
 
Req. No. 8578 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
custody and possession of the si dearm and badge carried by such 
employee immediately prior to retirement.  In addition to the 
sidearm carried by the commissione d employee immediately prior to 
retirement, the commissioned employee may purcha se the rifle or 
shotgun, or both, issued to the commissioned employee immediately 
prior to retirement upon approval from the Director.  The cost to 
the commissioned employee of purchasing the firearm shall be the 
state-approved firearms vendor trade-in value, and upon payment of 
that price, the commissioned employee shall be enti tled to ownership 
of the firearm.  Any records regarding the ownership of each firearm 
transferred shall be modified to reflect the transfer to the 
commissioned employee.  Proceeds from the purchase of th e firearm 
shall be deposited in the Bureau of Narcotics Revolving Fund 
established pursuant to Section 2-107 of this title. 
F.  A commissioned employee of the Bureau may be entitled to 
receive, upon retirement by reason of disability , the continued 
custody and possession of the si dearm and badge carried by such 
employee immediately prior to retirement upon written approval of 
the Director. 
G.  Custody and possession of the s idearm and badge of a 
commissioned employee killed in the lin e of duty may be awar ded by 
the Director to the spouse or next of kin of the deceased employee. 
H.  Custody and possession of the sidearm and badge of a 
commissioned employee who dies while emplo yed at the Oklahoma State   
 
Req. No. 8578 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Bureau of Narcotics and Dangerous D rugs Control may be a warded by 
the Director to the spouse or next of kin of the deceased employee. 
I.  Any Director appointed on or after July 1, 2003, shall be 
eligible to participate in either the Oklahoma Public Employees 
Retirement System or in the Okl ahoma Law Enforcement Retirement 
System and shall make an irrevocable election in writing to 
participate in one of the two retirement systems. 
J.  Any employee of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Nar cotics and 
Dangerous Drugs Control in a classified position u nder the Merit 
System of the Personnel Administr ation who is appointed Director, 
Deputy Director, Acting Director or Acting Deputy Director shall 
have a right to return to the highest previously held classified 
position without any loss of rights, privileg es or benefits 
immediately upon completion of th e duties of the employee, provided 
the employee is not otherwise disqualified. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2022. 
 
58-2-8578 GRS 11/19/21