Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3615 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/02/2022

                     
 
Req. No. 10910 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
HOUSE BILL NO. 3615 	By: Roberts (Dustin) 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to public health; amending 63 O.S. 
2021, Section 1-229.35, which relates to vapor 
manufacturers reporting; changing compliance 
deadline; and declaring an emergency. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLA HOMA: 
SECTION 1.    AMENDATORY     63 O.S. 2021, Section 1-229.35, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 1-229.35 A.  Beginning July 1, 2022 2023, every 
manufacturer of a vapor product that is sold or intended to be sold 
in this state, whether directly or through a distributor, re tailer, 
or similar intermediary or intermediaries, shall execute and deliver 
an attestation under penalty of perjury to the Oklahoma Alcoholic 
Beverage Laws Enforcement (ABLE) Commission cer tifying that, as of 
the date of such attestation: 
1.  The vapor product was available for pur chase in the United 
States as of August 8, 2016, and the manufacturer has applied for a   
 
Req. No. 10910 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
marketing order for the vapor product by submitting a Premarket 
Tobacco Product Application on or before September 9, 2020, to the 
United States Food and Drug Administr ation (FDA); or 
2.  The manufacturer has received a marketing order or other 
authorization for the vapor product from the FDA pursuant to Section 
387j of Title 21 of the United States Code. 
B.  The manufacturer shall notify the A BLE Commission within 
thirty (30) days of any material change to the attestation, 
including whether the FDA has issued or not issued a market order or 
other authorization or has ordered the manufacturer to remove the 
vapor product, either temporarily or pe rmanently, from the United 
States market. 
C.  The ABLE Commission shall develop a directory listing all of 
the manufacturers that have provided attestations that comply with 
subsection A of this section and all vapor products that are listed 
in such attestations.  The ABLE Commissio n shall: 
1.  Make the directory available for public inspection on its 
website on or before October 1, 2022 2023; and 
2.  Update the directory as necessary to corr ect mistakes and to 
add or remove manufacturers or vapor products to ma intain the 
directory in conformity with the requirements of this section. 
D.  It shall be unlawful for any person, directly or indirectly, 
to knowingly manufacture, distribute, sell, ba rter, or furnish in 
this state any vapor product that is not included i n the directory.   
 
Req. No. 10910 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 2.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by re ason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage an d approval. 
 
58-2-10910 KN 03/02/22