SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB3615 SFLR Page 1 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 SENATE FLOOR VERSION April 11, 2022 ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL NO. 3615 By: Ford of the House and Taylor of the Senate An Act relating to public health; amending 63 O.S. 2021, Section 1-229.35, which relates to vapor manufacturers reporting; changing compliance deadline; and declaring an emergency. BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLA HOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 63 O.S. 2021, Section 1-229.35, is amended to read as follows: Section 1-229.35 A. Beginning July 1, 2022 2023, every manufacturer of a vapor product that is sold or intended to be sold in this state, whether directly or through a distributor, re tailer, or similar intermediary or intermediaries, shall execute and deliver an attestation under penalty of perjury to the Oklahoma Alcoholic Beverage Laws Enforcement (ABLE) Commission cer tifying that, as of the date of such attestation: 1. The vapor product was available for purchase in the United States as of August 8, 2016, and the manufacturer has applied for a marketing order for the vap or product by submitting a Premarket SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB3615 SFLR Page 2 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 Tobacco Product Application on or before September 9, 2020, to the United States Food and Drug Administration (FDA); or 2. The manufacturer has received a marketing order or other authorization for the vapor product fr om the FDA pursuant to Section 387j of Title 21 of the United States Code. B. The manufacturer shall notify the A BLE Commission within thirty (30) days of any material change to the attestation, including whether the FDA has issued or not issued a market order or other authorization or has ordered the manufacturer to remove the vapor product, either temporarily or pe rmanently, from the United States market. C. The ABLE Commission shall develop a directory listing all of the manufacturers that have provide d attestations that comply with subsection A of this section and all vapor products that are listed in such attestations. The ABLE Commission shall: 1. Make the directory available for public inspection on its website on or before October 1, 2022 2023; and 2. Update the directory as necessary to corr ect mistakes and to add or remove manufacturers or vapor products to ma intain the directory in conformity with the requirements of this section. D. It shall be unlawful for any person, directly or indirectly , to knowingly manufacture, distribute, sell, ba rter, or furnish in this state any vapor product that is not included i n the directory. SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB3615 SFLR Page 3 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 SECTION 2. It being immediately necessary for the p reservation of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby declared to exist, by re ason whereof this act shall take effect and be in full force from and after its passage and approval. COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVI CES April 11, 2022 - DO PASS