Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3615 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/26/2022

                    An Act 
ENROLLED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 3615 	By: Ford of the House   
 
  and 
 
  Taylor of the Senate  
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to public health; amending 63 O.S. 
2021, Section 1-229.35, which relates to vapor 
manufacturers reporting; changing compliance 
deadline; and declaring an emergency. 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT: Public health 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLA HOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.    AMENDATORY     63 O.S. 2021, Section 1-229.35, is 
amended to read as follows: 
 
Section 1-229.35 A.  Beginning July 1, 2022 2023, every 
manufacturer of a vapor product that is sold or intended to be sold 
in this state, whether directly or through a distributor, re tailer, 
or similar intermediary or intermediaries, shall execute and deliver 
an attestation under penalty of perjur y to the Oklahoma Alcoholic 
Beverage Laws Enforcement (ABLE) Commission cer tifying that, as of 
the date of such attestation: 
 
1.  The vapor product was available for purchase in the United 
States as of August 8, 2016, and the manufacturer has applied for a 
marketing order for the vap or product by submitting a Premarket 
Tobacco Product Application on or before September 9, 2020, to the 
United States Food and Drug Administration (FDA); or 
 
2.  The manufacturer has received a marketing order or other 
authorization for the vapor product fr om the FDA pursuant to Section 
387j of Title 21 of the United States Code. 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 3615 	Page 2 
B.  The manufacturer shall notify the A BLE Commission within 
thirty (30) days of any material change to the attestation, 
including whether the FDA has is sued or not issued a market order or 
other authorization or has ordered the manufacturer to remove the 
vapor product, either temporarily or pe rmanently, from the United 
States market. 
 
C.  The ABLE Commission shall develop a directory listing all of 
the manufacturers that have provide d attestations that comply with 
subsection A of this section and all vapor products that are listed 
in such attestations.  The ABLE Commission shall: 
 
1.  Make the directory available for public inspection on its 
website on or before October 1, 2022 2023; and 
 
2.  Update the directory as necessary to corr ect mistakes and to 
add or remove manufacturers or vapor products to ma intain the 
directory in conformity with the requirements of this section. 
 
D.  It shall be unlawful for an y person, directly or indirectly , 
to knowingly manufacture, distribute, sell, ba rter, or furnish in 
this state any vapor product that is not included i n the directory. 
 
SECTION 2.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by re ason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval.  ENR. H. B. NO. 3615 	Page 3 
Passed the House of Representatives the 23rd day of March, 2022. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the 25th day of April, 2022. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ 
day of ___________________, 20_ ______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________