HB4466 HFLR Page 1 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION STATE OF OKLAHOMA 2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR HOUSE BILL NO. 4466 By: Wallace and Martinez of the House and Thompson and Hall of the Senate COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE An Act relating to the Department of Human Services; requiring that certain funds be utilized for certain purpose; requiring certain funding be used as additional or supplemental funding; requiring certain funding be maintained at certain levels; requiring certain joint approval prior to certain actions; requiring certain tran sfers to certain funds; appropriating certain federal funds for certain program; authorizing early allocation of funds under certain conditions; auth orizing certain transfers; requiring the maintenance of certain records; providing budgeting and expenditure limitations and procedures; providing for lapse of funds under certain conditions; and requiring and prohibiting certain budget procedures . BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF T HE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: HB4466 HFLR Page 2 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 SECTION 1. From the funds appropriated to the Department of Human Services in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Thirty-two Million Five Hundred Thousand Doll ars ($32,500,000.00) shall be used for providing Home and Community -Based Waiver services for persons with developmental disabilities. These funds shall be used to provide additional services and programs for pers ons with developmental disabilities in order to eliminate the Developmental Disabilities Services Division Waiting List fo r all people waiting as of May 1, 2022, and to implement a twenty-five percent (25%) increase in rates for all services within the Home and Community-Based Services Waivers to ensure access to services for people with developmental disabilities and those ser ved through the ADvantage Waiver. Such funds shall be used to supplement rather than replace existing resources and programs. SECTION 2. From the funds appropriated to the Department of Human Services in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legis lature, the sum of Two Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ( $2,500,000.00) shall be used to maintain the funding levels from the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, of Senior Nutrition programs in rural communities across Oklahoma. The Oklahoma Legislature requires joint approval from the President Pro Tempore of the Oklahoma State Senate and the Speaker of the Oklahoma House of Representatives before any Senior Nutrition sites may be HB4466 HFLR Page 3 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 closed due to declining attendance or increased operational costs during the fiscal year ending June 30, 20 23. SECTION 3. From the funds appropriated to the Department of Human Services in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of One Million One Thousand Eight Hundred Six Dollars ( $1,001,806.00) shall be used to fund debt service obligations for the renovation and construction of the Robert M. Greer Center located in Enid, Oklahoma. SECTION 4. From the funds appropriated to the Department of Human Services in Enrol led Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of One Million One Hundr ed Thousand Dollars ($1,100,000.00) shall be used for a nutrition incentive program that helps low income families purchase fresh fruits and vegetables. SECTION 5. From the funds appropriated to the Department of Human Services in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the Department of Human Se rvices shall transfer Two Million Eight Hundred Thousand Dollars ($2,800,000.00) to the credit of the Child Abuse Multidiscipli nary Account established in Section 1-9-103 of Title 10A of the Oklahoma Statutes, which shall be distributed according to Sectio n 1-9-104 of Title 10A of the Oklahoma Statutes. SECTION 6. There is hereby appr opriated to the Department of Human Services all federal monies received by the state during the HB4466 HFLR Page 4 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 fiscal year ending June 30, 2023, from the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Block Grant and the Child Care and Development Fund Block Grant to meet the p rovisions of federal law relating to such grants. SECTION 7. The Director of the Department of Human Services may request through the Director o f the Office of Management and Enterprise Services the early transfer by the Oklahoma Tax Commission of tax collections to the General Revenue Fund for the purpose of early allocation to the Department's disbursing funds to alleviate cash-flow problems. SECTION 8. A. The Director of the Of fice of Management and Enterprise Services s hall transfer monies appropriated f rom the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services' disbursing funds in the amounts and ratios requested by the a gency except that the cumulative amount transferre d shall not exceed the cumulative amount of equal monthly allotments of the app ropriations from the General Revenue Fund. B. Monies appropriated or collected for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023, may b e transferred to these disbursing funds for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, to satisfy e ncumbrances and obligations of the f iscal year; provided , that monies equal in amount are transferred from appropriations or collections for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, to the disbursing funds for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023, to satisfy encumbrances and HB4466 HFLR Page 5 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 obligations of the fiscal year. All transfer requests shall be in writing to the Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. C. The Department of Human Services shall maintain re cords of such interyear transfers. SECTION 9. The Director of Human Services may request the Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise Services to transfer monies between the Dep artment of Human Services Support Service Providers Grant Program Fund and the Human Services Disbursing Fund or the Department of Human Service s Medical and Assistance Fund, as needed for the expenditure of funds. SECTION 10. Appropriations made by Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of the 58th Oklahoma Leg islature, not including appropriations made for capital outlay pu rposes, may be budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY-23), or may be budgeted for th e fiscal year ending June 30, 2024 (hereafter FY-24). Funds budgeted for FY -23 may be encumbered only through June 30, 2023 , and must be expended by November 15, 2023. Any funds remaining after November 15, 2023, and not budgeted for FY-24, shall lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year. Funds budgeted for FY-24 may be encumbered only through June 30, 2024. Any funds remaining after November 15, 2024, shall lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year. These appropriations shall not be budgeted in HB4466 HFLR Page 6 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 both fiscal years simultaneously. Funds budgeted in FY-23, and not required to pay obligation s for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY-24, after the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds from the FY-23 budget work program and after such revision has been approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON JOINT COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS AND BUDGET, dated 05/17/2022 - DO PASS, As Amended.