Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4466 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/20/2022

                    An Act 
ENROLLED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 4466 	By: Wallace, Martinez, and 
Lawson of the House 
 
   and 
 
  Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Department of Human Services; 
requiring that certain funds be utilized for certain 
purpose; requiring certain funding be used as 
additional or supplemental funding; requiring certain 
funding be maintained at certain levels; requiring 
certain joint approval prior to certain actions; 
requiring certain tran sfers to certain funds; 
appropriating certain federal funds for certain 
program; authorizing early allocation of funds under 
certain conditions; auth orizing certain transfers; 
requiring the maintenance of certain records; 
providing budgeting and expenditure limitations and 
procedures; providing for lapse of fu nds under 
certain conditions; and requiring and prohibiting 
certain budget procedures . 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT: Department of Human Services 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF T HE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.  From the funds appropriated to the Department of 
Human Services in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session 
of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Thirty-two Million Five 
Hundred Thousand Doll ars ($32,500,000.00) shall be used for 
providing Home and Community -Based Waiver services for persons with 
developmental disabilities.  These funds shall be used to provide 
additional services and programs for pers ons with developmental 
disabilities in order to eliminate the Developmental Disabilities  ENR. H. B. NO. 4466 	Page 2 
Services Division Waiting List fo r all people waiting as of May 1, 
2022, and to implement a twenty-five percent (25%) increase in rates 
for all services within the Home and Community-Based Services 
Waivers to ensure access to services for people with developmental 
disabilities and those ser ved through the ADvantage Waiver.  Such 
funds shall be used to supplement rather than replace existing 
resources and programs. 
 
SECTION 2.  From the funds appropriated to the Department of 
Human Services in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session 
of the 58th Oklahoma Legis lature, the sum of Two Million Five 
Hundred Thousand Dollars ( $2,500,000.00) shall be used to maintain 
the funding levels from the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, of 
Senior Nutrition programs in rural communities across Oklaho ma.  The 
Oklahoma Legislature requires joint approval from the President Pro 
Tempore of the Oklahoma State Senate and the Speaker of the Oklahoma 
House of Representatives before any Senior Nutrition sites may be 
closed due to declining attendance or increased operational costs 
during the fiscal year ending June 30, 20 23. 
 
SECTION 3.  From the funds appropriated to the Department of 
Human Services in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session 
of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of One Million One 
Thousand Eight Hundre d Six Dollars ($1,001,806.00) shall be used to 
fund debt service obligations for the renovation and construction of 
the Robert M. Greer Center located in Enid, Oklahoma. 
 
SECTION 4.  From the funds appropriated to the Department of 
Human Services in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session 
of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of One Million One Hundr ed 
Thousand Dollars ($1,100,000.00) shall be used for a nutrition 
incentive program that helps low-income families purchase fresh 
fruits and vegetables. 
 
SECTION 5.  From the funds appropriated to the Department of 
Human Services in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session 
of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the Department of Human Services 
shall transfer Two Million Eight Hundred Thousand Dollars 
($2,800,000.00) to the credit of the Child Abuse Multidiscipli nary 
Account established in Section 1-9-103 of Title 10A of the Oklahoma 
Statutes, which shall be distributed according to Section 1-9-104 of 
Title 10A of the Oklahoma Statutes. 
 
SECTION 6.  There is hereby appr opriated to the Department of 
Human Services all federal monies received by the state during the  ENR. H. B. NO. 4466 	Page 3 
fiscal year ending June 30, 2023, from the Temporary Assistance for 
Needy Families Block Grant and the Child Care and Development Fund 
Block Grant to meet the p rovisions of federal law relating to such 
grants. 
 
SECTION 7.  The Director of the Department of Human Services may 
request through the Director of the Office of Management and 
Enterprise Services the early transfer by the Oklahoma Tax 
Commission of tax collections to the General Revenue Fund for the 
purpose of early allocation to the Department's disbursing funds to 
alleviate cash-flow problems. 
 
SECTION 8.  A.  The Director of the Of fice of Management and 
Enterprise Services s hall transfer monies appropriated f rom the 
General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services' disbursing 
funds in the amounts and ratios r equested by the agency except that 
the cumulative amount transferre d shall not exceed the cumulative 
amount of equal monthly allotments of the app ropriations from the 
General Revenue Fund. 
 
B.  Monies appropriated or collected for the fiscal year ending 
June 30, 2023, may be transferred to these disbursing funds for the 
fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, to satisfy e ncumbrances and 
obligations of the f iscal year; provided , that monies equal in 
amount are transferred from appropriations or collections for the 
fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, to the disbursing funds for the 
fiscal year ending June 30, 2023, to satisfy encumbrances and 
obligations of the fiscal year.  All transfer requests shall be in 
writing to the Director of the Office of Management and Ente rprise 
Services. 
 
C.  The Department of Human Services shall maintain re cords of 
such interyear transfers. 
 
SECTION 9.  The Director of Human Services may request the 
Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise Services to 
transfer monies between the Dep artment of Human Services Support 
Service Providers Grant Program Fund and the Human Services 
Disbursing Fund or the Department of Human Service s Medical and 
Assistance Fund, as needed for the expenditure of funds. 
 
SECTION 10.  Appropriations made by Enrolled Senate Bill No. 
1040 of the 2nd Session of the 58th Oklahoma Leg islature, not 
including appropriations made for capital outlay pu rposes, may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY-23),  ENR. H. B. NO. 4466 	Page 4 
or may be budgeted for th e fiscal year ending June 30, 2024 
(hereafter FY-24).  Funds budgeted for FY -23 may be encumbered only 
through June 30, 2023 , and must be expended by November 15, 2023. 
Any funds remaining after November 15, 2023, and not budgeted f or 
FY-24, shall lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then 
current fiscal year. Funds budgeted for FY-24 may be encumbered 
only through June 30, 2024. Any funds remaining after November 15, 
2024, shall lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then 
current fiscal year.  These appropriations shall not be budgeted in 
both fiscal years simultaneously. Funds budgeted in FY-23, and not 
required to pay obligation s for that fiscal year, may be budgeted 
for FY-24, after the agency to which the fund s have been 
appropriated has prepared and submitted a budget work program 
revision removing these funds from the FY-23 budget work program and 
after such revision has been approved by the Office of Management 
and Enterprise Services. 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 4466 	Page 5 
Passed the House of R epresentatives the 18th day of May, 2022. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the 20th day of May, 2022. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this _ ___________________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock ______ _ M. 
 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________