Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1021 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/21/2021

                     
 
 
Req. No. 872 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
SENATE BILL 1021 	By: David 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to oil and gas; creating the Hydrogen 
Pipeline Task Force; providing for membership of task 
force; providing duties of task force; requiring a 
quorum for certain action; requir ing task force meet 
with certain frequency ; authorizing the chair to call 
meetings; subjecting meetings to Oklahom a Open 
Meetings Act and the Oklahoma Open Records Act; 
providing that members recei ve no compensation; 
requiring certain report by certain date; requiring 
task force report to certain persons; providing for 
noncodification; providing an effective date ; and 
declaring an emergency . 
 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPL E OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law not to be 
codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: 
There is hereby created the Hydrogen Production, Transportation 
and Infrastructure Task Force until December 31, 2021. 
A.  The task force shall be comprised of fifteen (15) members as 
follows: 
1.  The chair shall be the Secretary of Energy and Environment. 
2.  The co-chairs shall be:   
 
 
Req. No. 872 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
a. one member appointed by the President Pro Tempore of 
the Senate, and 
b. one member appointed by the Speaker of the House of 
Representatives; 
3.  Two members shall be: 
a.  one member appointed by the President Pro Tempore of 
the Senate, and 
b.  one member appointed by the Sp eaker of the House of 
Representatives; 
4.  Ten members shall be appointed by the chair of the task 
force as follows: 
a. a member representing the Secretary of Commerce; 
b.  a member representing the Secretary of Transportation; 
c.  a member representing the Corporation Commission. 
d.  a member representing the Oklahoma Water Re sources 
Board,  
e.  a member representing the Oklahoma Cent er for Science 
and Technology 
f.  a member representing the Grand River Dam Authority, 
g.  a member representing an oil and gas midstream service 
provider, 
h. a member representing a regulated natural gas 
distribution company , 
i. a member representing an electric service pro vider, and   
 
 
Req. No. 872 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
j.  a member representing a company producing, or looking 
to produce, hydrogen fuel. 
B.  A quorum of the task force shall be required to approve any 
final action of the task force.  A quorum shall be determined by the 
chair of the task force. 
C.  The task force shall meet at least once per month .  The 
chair shall call the first meeting and all subsequent meetings shall 
be made at the call of the chair. 
D.  The task force shall: 
1.  Investigate on the viability of utilizing the existing 
pipeline infrastructure in this state to move hydrogen fuel; and 
2.  Investigate the existing and potential needs of the pipeline 
industry to integrate hydrogen fuel; and 
3.  Investigate opportunities to ensure this state is positioned 
to support the future development of the hydrogen fuel sector; and 
4.  Investigate the availability for cost competitive electric 
power necessary for producing hydrogen fuel; and 
5.  Investigate the taxation treatment of hydrogen fuel; and 
6.  Investigate incentives for necessary pip eline transmission 
of hydrogen fuel, the production of hydrogen fuel and ena bling 
hydrogen fuel vehicle mobility; and 
7.  Investigate a state -wide roadmap for a hydrogen economy 
including, but not limited to, vehicles, infrastructure, production, 
distribution and off-taker market users.   
 
 
Req. No. 872 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
E.  The meetings of the task force shall be subject to the 
Oklahoma Open Meeting Act and the Oklahoma Open Records Act. 
F.  The members of the task force shall receive no compensation 
or travel reimbursem ent. 
G.  The task force shall submit a report of its findings and 
recommendations including fiscal impact statements on all of the 
recommendations of the task force no later than December 1, 2021, to 
the Governor, the President Pro Tempore of the Senate and the 
Speaker of the House of Representatives . 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2021. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for t he preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
58-1-872 APW 2/4/2021 4:32:18 PM