Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1043 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/19/2022

                     
 
SB1043 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) 
 
ENGROSSED SENATE 
BILL NO. 1043 	By: Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Wallace and Martinez of the 
House 
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the State Department of Health; 
requiring that portions of certain appropriated funds 
be used for certain purpos es; stating purpose of 
certain disbursement; requiring the use of certain 
data; directing the Department to develop method of 
disbursement; authorizing pro mulgation of rules; 
providing for lapse of funds under certain 
conditions; requiring certain budget p rocedures; and 
prohibiting certain budget procedures . 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.  From the funds appropriated to the State Department 
of Health in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of the 
58th Oklahoma Legislatur e, the sum of One Hundred Thousand Dollars 
($100,000.00) shall be used fo r increased sickle cell outreach. 
SECTION 2.  From the funds appropriated to the State Department 
of Health in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of the   
 
SB1043 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
58th Oklahoma Legislatur e, the sum of Two Million Five Hundred 
Thousand Dollars ($2,500,000.00) shall be used for targeted salary 
adjustments for agency employees involved in public health . 
SECTION 3.  From the funds appropriated to the State Department 
of Health in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of the 
58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Two Hundred Thousand Dollars 
($200,000.00) shall be used for the operations of the Oklahoma 
Athletic Commission, pursuant to the provisions of the Oklahoma 
State Athletic Commission Act. 
SECTION 4.  From the funds appropriated to the St ate Department 
of Health in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of the 
58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Three Million Dollars 
($3,000,000.00) shall be used for the con tinuation of the Choosing 
Childbirth Act by the provisions listed in Se ction 1-740.15 et seq. 
of Title 63 of the Oklahoma Statutes. 
SECTION 5.  From the funds appropriated to the State Department 
of Health in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of the 
58th Oklahoma Legislat ure, One Million Nine Hu ndred Thousand Dollars 
($1,900,000.00) shall be disbursed to health centers authorized 
under Section 330 of the Public Health Service Act, and incorporated 
in the State of Oklahoma.  An y disbursement shall be for the purpose 
of increasing access to primary health care which may include 
medical, dental, and or mental health and substance abuse treatment 
services in or near designated Medically Underserved Areas or   
 
SB1043 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Medically Underserved Po pulations.  Any disbursemen t for increased 
access to primary health care services shall be supported by data 
according to proportions of patient volume and access for unins ured.  
The method of disbursement shall be developed by the State 
Department of Health.  The State Commissioner of Health is 
authorized to promulgate the method of disbursement into rules. 
SECTION 6.  Appropriations made by Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 
of the 2nd Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, not including 
appropriations made for capita l outlay purposes, may be budgeted for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY-23) or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024 (hereafter FY-24).  
Funds budgeted for FY -23 may be encumbered only throug h June 30, 
2023, and must be expended by November 15, 2023.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 202 3, and not budgeted for FY -24, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY -24 may be encumbered only through June 
30, 2024. Any funds remaining afte r November 15, 2024, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.  
These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY -23, and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY-24, after 
the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds   
 
SB1043 HFLR 	Page 4 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
from the FY-23 budget work program and after such revision has been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. 
 
DIRECT TO CALENDAR.