Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1054 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/11/2021

                     
 
 
Req. No. 1797 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
SENATE BILL 1054 	By: Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Wallace and Hilbert of the 
House 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to appropriations; making an 
appropriation to the Department of Public Safety ; 
stating purpose; providing lapse dates; requiring and 
prohibiting certain budget procedures; and declaring 
an emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.  There is hereby appropriated to the Department of 
Public Safety from any monies not otherwise appropriated from the 
General Revenue Fund of the State Treasury for the fiscal year 
ending June 30, 2022, the sum of One Hundred Thousand Dollars 
($100,000.00) or so much th ereof as may be necessary to perform the 
duties imposed upon the Department of Public Safety by law. 
SECTION 2.  Appropriations made by this act , not including 
appropriations made for capit al outlay purposes, may be budgeted for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022 (hereafter FY-22), or may be   
 
 
Req. No. 1797 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY-23).  
Funds budgeted for F Y-22 may be encumbered only through June 30, 
2022, and must be expended by November 15, 2022.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2022, and not budgeted for FY -23, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current f iscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY -23 may be encumbered only through June 
30, 2023. Any funds remaining after November 15, 2023, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.  
These appropriations may not be b udgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY -22 and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted f or FY-23, after 
the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds 
from the FY-22 budget work program and after such revisio n has been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from an d after its passage and approval. 
 
58-1-1797 RC 2/11/2021 3:10:15 PM