Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1054 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2021

                     
 
Req. No. 2191 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021 ) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
SENATE BILL 1054 	By: Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Wallace and Hilbert of the 
House 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to the Department of Public Safety; 
authorizing certain expenditures for certain 
purposes; authorizing the Department of Public Safety 
to hold additional trooper academies subject to 
available funding; authori zing use of certain 
revolving fund; providing lapse dates; and requiring 
and prohibiting certain budget procedures. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.  From the funds appropriated to the Department of 
Public Safety in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of 
the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the Department of Public Safety is 
hereby authorized to expend Four Hundred Thirty-nine Thousand One 
Hundred Twenty Dollars ($439,120.00) for any necessary expenditures 
related to interoperable communications inside the State Capitol 
Building.   
 
Req. No. 2191 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 2.  From the funds appropriated to the Department of 
Public Safety in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of 
the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the Department of Public Safety is 
hereby authorized to expend Four Million Dollars ($4,000,000.00) to 
hold a trooper academy . Subject to available funding , the 
Department is authorized to hold addition al academies. 
SECTION 3.  Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the 
Department of Public Safety is hereby authorized to utilize the 
Department of Public Safety Restricted Revolving Fund (245 Fund), as 
may be necessary to perform the d uties imposed upon the Department 
of Public Safety by law . 
SECTION 4.  Appropriations ma de by this act, not including 
appropriations made for capital outlay purposes, may be budgeted for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022 (hereafter FY -22), or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY -23).  
Funds budgeted for FY -22 may be encumbered only through June 30, 
2022, and must be expended by November 15, 2022.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2022, and not bud geted for FY-23, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY-23 may be encumbered only through June 
30, 2023.  Any funds remaining after November 15, 2023, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fu nd for the then current fiscal year.  
These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY -22, and not required to pay   
 
Req. No. 2191 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY -23, after 
the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work program revision removing these fun ds 
from the FY-22 budget work program and after such revision has been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. 
 
58-1-2191 RC 5/17/2021 7:37:18 PM