Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1055 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/11/2021

                     
 
 
Req. No. 1800 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
SENATE BILL 1055 	By: Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Wallace and Hilbert of the 
House 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to appropriations; making an 
appropriation to the District Courts; stating 
purpose; providing lapse dates; requiring and 
prohibiting certain budget procedures; and declaring 
an emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.  There is hereby appropriated to the District Courts 
from any monies not otherwise appropriated from the General Revenue 
Fund of the State Treasury for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, 
the sum of One Hundred T housand Dollars ($100,000.00) or so much 
thereof as may be necessary to perform the duties imposed upon the 
District Courts by law. 
SECTION 2.  Appropriations made by this act, not incl uding 
appropriations made for capital outlay purposes, may be budgeted for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022 (hereafter FY-22), or may be   
 
 
Req. No. 1800 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY-23). 
Funds budgeted for FY -22 may be encumbered only through J une 30, 
2022, and must be expended by November 15, 2022.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2022, and not budgeted for FY-23, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY -23 may be encumbered only through June 
30, 2023.  Any funds remaining after Novemb er 15, 2023, shall lapse 
to the credit of the prope r fund for the then current fiscal year.  
These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY -22 and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year, ma y be budgeted for FY-23, after 
the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work progr am revision removing these fun ds 
from the FY-22 budget work program and after such revision has been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, a n emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
58-1-1800 RC 2/11/2021 3:11:17 PM