Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1081 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2021

                     
 
Req. No. 2190 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
SENATE BILL 1081 	By: Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Wallace and Hilbert of the 
House 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Historical Society; 
requiring no less than certain amount of certain 
funds be used for certain purpose; providing for 
lapse of funds under certain conditions; requiring 
certain budget procedures; and prohibiti ng certain 
budget procedures. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF T HE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Historical Society in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st 
Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, not less than One Hundred 
Fifty Thousand Dollars ($150,000.00) shall be used to hire a grant 
writer for Black Towns in Oklahoma . 
SECTION 2.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Historical Society in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st 
Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, not less than One Hundred   
 
Req. No. 2190 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Fifty Thousand Dollars ($150,000.00) shall be used to provide grants 
for schools to provide transportation to The Freedom Center & Clara 
Luper Civil Rights Center, Th e Greenwood Historic District, and The 
Oklahoma City National Memorial & Museum . 
SECTION 3.  Appropriations made to the Oklahoma Hist orical 
Society by Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the 
58th Oklahoma Legislature, not including ap propriations made for 
capital outlay purposes, may be budgeted for the fiscal year ending 
June 30, 2022 (hereafter FY-22), or may be budgeted for the fiscal 
year ending June 30, 202 3 (hereafter FY-23).  Funds budgeted for FY-
22 may be encumbered only throu gh June 30, 2022, and must be 
expended by November 15, 2022.  Any funds remaining after November 
15, 2022, and not budgeted for FY -23, shall lapse to the credit of 
the proper fund for the then current fiscal yea r. Funds budgeted 
for FY-23 may be encumbered only through June 30, 202 3.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2023, shall lapse to the credit of the 
proper fund for the then current fiscal year.  These appropriations 
shall not be budgeted in both fisc al years simultaneously.  Funds 
budgeted in FY-22, and not required to pay obliga tions for that 
fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY-23, after the agency to which 
the funds have been appropriated has prepared and submitted a budget 
work program revision rem oving these funds from the FY -22 budget  
   
 
Req. No. 2190 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
work program and after such revision ha s been approved by the Office 
of Management and Enterprise Services . 
 
58-1-2190 JR 5/17/2021 7:38:37 PM