Req. No. 2200 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 STATE OF OKLAHOMA 1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR SENATE BILL 1082 By: Thompson and Hall of the Senate and Wallace and Hilbert of the House COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE An Act relating to the Oklahoma Department of Commerce; requiring that portions of certain appropriated funds be used for certain purposes ; providing for lapse of funds under certain conditions; requiring certain budget procedures; and prohibiting certain budget procedures . BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma Department of Commerce in Section 38 of Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the Department of Commerce shall spend One Million Four Hundred Sixty Thousand Dollars ($1,460,000.00) to implement the provisions of Section 5003.12 of Title 74 of the Oklahoma Statu tes. These funds shall be used to supplement rather than replace existing resour ces. Req. No. 2200 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 SECTION 2. From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma Department of Commerce in Section 149 of Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, not less than Fifteen Million Dollars ($15,000,000.00) shall be used to fund and implement the Oklahoma Accelerator Program . In addition to the funds appropriated, this program shall leverage private capital with the objective of stimulating growth of early-stage startup companies throughout this state by connecting them with global entrepreneurial ecosystems to drive business talent and investment opportunities. SECTION 3. Appropriations made to the Oklahoma Department of Commerce by Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, not including appropriations made for capital outlay purposes, may be budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022 (hereafter FY-22), or may be budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY-23). Funds budgeted for FY- 22 may be encumbered only through June 30, 2022, and must be expended by November 15, 2022. Any funds remaining after November 15, 2022, and not budgeted for FY -23, shall lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year. Fun ds budgeted for FY-23 may be encumbered only through June 30, 2023. Any funds remaining after November 15, 2023, shall lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year. These appropriations shall not be budgeted in both fiscal year s simultaneously. Funds budgeted in FY-22, and not required to pay obligations for that Req. No. 2200 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY -23, after the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared and submitted a budget work program revision removing t hese funds from the FY-22 budget work program and after such revision has been approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services . 58-1-2200 JR 5/17/2021 7:38:38 PM