Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1082 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                     
 
 
An Act 
ENROLLED SENATE 
BILL NO. 1082 	By: Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Wallace and Hilbert of the 
House 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Department of 
Commerce; requiring that portions of certain 
appropriated funds be used for certain pu rposes; 
providing for lapse of funds under certain 
conditions; requiring certain budget procedures; and 
prohibiting certain budget procedures . 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT:  Oklahoma Department of Commerce 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1. From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Commerce in Section 38 of Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 
of the 1st Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the Department 
of Commerce shall spend One Million Four Hundred Sixty Thousand 
Dollars ($1,460,000.00) to implement the provisions of Section 
5003.12 of Title 74 of the Oklahoma Statu tes. These funds shall be 
used to supplement rather than replace existing resour ces. 
 
SECTION 2. From the funds appropriated to the Oklaho ma 
Department of Commerce in Section 149 of Enrolled House Bill No. 
2900 of the 1st Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, not less 
than Fifteen Million Dollars ($15,000,000.00) shall be used to fund 
and implement the Oklahoma Accelerator Program . In addition to the 
funds appropriated, this program shall leverage private capital with 
the objective of stimulating growth of early-stage startup companies   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 1082 	Page 2 
throughout this state by connecting them with global entrepreneurial 
ecosystems to drive business talent and investment opportunit ies. 
 
SECTION 3.  Appropriations made to the Oklahoma Department of 
Commerce by Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the 
58th Oklahoma Legislature, not including appropriations made for 
capital outlay purposes, may be budgeted for the fiscal year ending 
June 30, 2022 (hereafter FY-22), or may be budgeted for the fiscal 
year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY-23).  Funds budgeted for FY-
22 may be encumbered only through June 30, 2022, and must be 
expended by November 15, 2022.  Any funds remaining after November 
15, 2022, and not budgeted for FY -23, shall lapse to the credit of 
the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.  Fun ds budgeted 
for FY-23 may be encumbered only through June 30, 2023.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2023, shall lapse to the credit of the 
proper fund for the then current fiscal year.  These appropriations 
shall not be budgeted in both fiscal year s simultaneously.  Funds 
budgeted in FY-22, and not required to pay obligations for that 
fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY-23, after the agency to which 
the funds have been appropriated has prepared and submitted a budget 
work program revision removing t hese funds from the FY-22 budget 
work program and after such revision has been approved by the Office 
of Management and Enterprise Services . 
   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 1082 	Page 3 
Passed the Senate the 18th day of May, 2021. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
Passed the House of Representatives the 20th day of May, 2021. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this _______ _____________ 
day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _______________________________ __ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Okl ahoma this _________ 
day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this ______ ____ 
day of __________________, 20 _______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _______________________________ __