Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1280 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/25/2022

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1280 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
February 22, 2022 
 
 
SENATE BILL NO. 1280 	By: Daniels of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Gann of the House 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Partnership for 
School Readiness Board; amending 10 O.S. 2021, 
Section 640.1, which relates to membership of the 
Board; removing language requiring certain 
appointments to be made from certain lists; updating 
reference; providing an effective date; and declaring 
an emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     10 O.S. 2021, Section 640.1, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 640.1. A.  There is hereby re-created until July 1 , 
2024, in accordance with the Oklaho ma Sunset Law, the Oklahoma 
Partnership for School Readiness Board.  The Board shall promote 
school readiness supp orting community-based efforts to increase the 
number of children who are ready to succeed by the time they enter 
school.  The Board shall additionally serve as the state's Early 
Childhood Advisory Council and fulfill the responsibilities 
described in the Head Start Act of 2007 (PL 110 -134, Section 642B).    
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1280 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
The Board shall consist of rep resentatives from the private and 
public sectors as follows: 
1.  Fifteen private sector representatives appointed by the 
Governor from a list submitted by an existing private -sector school 
readiness initiative that includes in its focus community 
mobilization and public engagement activities to include: 
a. two parents of children eight (8) years of age or 
younger, and 
b. one representative of licensed child care providers; 
2.  One representative of the licensed child care industry 
appointed by the Gover nor from a list submitted by an association 
representing the lic ensed child care industry in this state; 
3.  One representative of a state association of federally 
funded early childhood programs appointed by the Governor; and 
4.  To ensure that existing resources are being utilized 
effectively, fifteen public sector r epresentatives or their 
designees as follows: 
a. State Superintendent of Public Instruction, 
b. State Commissioner of Health, 
c. Commissioner of the Department of Mental Health and 
Substance Abuse Services, 
d. Director of the Oklahoma Department of Commerc e, 
e. Director of the Oklahoma Department of Libraries, 
f. Director of the Department of Human Services,   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1280 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
g. Administrator of the Oklahoma Health Care Authority, 
h. Director of the Oklahoma Commission on Children and 
Youth, 
i. Director of the State Departme nt of Rehabilitation 
Services, 
j. Executive Director of the Oklahoma Educational 
Television Authority, 
k. Director of the Oklahoma Department of Career and 
Technology Education, 
l. Chancellor of the Oklahoma State Regents for Higher 
Education, 
m. Cabinet Secretary with responsibility for education 
agencies, 
n. Dean of the College of Education and Human 
Environmental Sciences, Oklahoma State University, and 
o. State Director of Head Start Col laboration. 
B.  Members appointed by the Governor shall serve terms of four 
(4) years; provided, of those membe rs initially appointed to the 
Board, eight members shall be appointed for two -year terms, 
beginning September 1, 2003, and seven members shall b e appointed 
for four-year terms, beginning September 1, 2003, as designated by 
the Governor.  The member appointed pursuant to paragraph 2 of 
subsection A of this section shall be appointed for an initial term 
to end on August 31, 2007 .  The member appointed pursuant to   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1280 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
paragraph 3 of subsection A of this section shall be appointed f or 
an initial term to end on Augu st 31, 2009.  Appointed members shall 
continue in office until a successor is appoin ted by the Governor.  
The Governor shall fill all vacancies in the same manner as the 
original appointment was made. 
C.  The Director of the Department of Human Services sh all 
convene an organizational meeting of the Oklahoma Partnership for 
School Readiness Board prior to November 1, 2003, at which time 
members of the Board shall elect a chair, a vice-chair vice chair, 
and other officers as needed.  A majority of the member s of the 
Board shall constitute a quorum for the transaction of business. 
D.  Members of the Board shall receive no compensation for 
serving on the Board but shall receive travel reimbursement as 
follows: 
1.  State agency officers and employees who are mem bers of the 
Board shall be reimbursed for travel expenses incurred in the 
performance of their duties by their respective agencies in 
accordance with the State Travel Reimbursement Act; and 
2.  Remaining members shall be re imbursed by the Board from any 
funds received by the Board for travel expenses incurred in the 
performance of their duties in ac cordance with the State Travel 
Reimbursement Act.   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1280 SFLR 	Page 5 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
E.  Members of the Board shall be exempt from the dual -office-
holding provisions of Section 6 of Title 51 of th e Oklahoma 
Statutes. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2022. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION 
February 22, 2022 - DO PASS