Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1546 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/03/2022

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1546 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
March 2, 2022 
 
 
SENATE BILL NO. 1546 	By: McCortney and Treat 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Red River Boundary Commission; 
amending 74 O.S. 2021, Section s 6111 and 6112, which 
relate to the appointment of the chairperson and 
report required from Commission; updating statutory 
references; modifying certain dates; and providing an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     74 O.S. 2021, Section 61 11, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 6111. The chairperson of the Red River Boundary 
Commission shall be jointly appointed by the Governor, the President 
Pro Tempore of the Sen ate and the Speaker of the House of 
Representatives from the Commission m embers identified in Section 1 
of this act Section 6110 of this title, no later than thirty (30) 
days after the effective date of this act April 28, 2021.  The first 
meeting of the Red River Boundary Commission, as re-created in 
Section 1 of this act Section 6110 of this title, shall be held at 
the call of the chairperson but no later than December 31, 2021 
December 31, 2022.   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1546 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 2.     AMENDATORY     74 O.S. 2021 , Section 6112, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 6112. A.  The Red River Boundary Commission shall 
confer and act in conjunction with the representatives to be 
appointed on behalf of the State of Texas for the following 
purposes: 
1.  To evaluate the methods, surveys, historical maps, and other 
information used to establish the boundary line between this state 
and the State of Texas in the Texoma Area, as such area is defined 
in the Texoma Area Boundary Agreement; 
2.  To determine the location of the south bank of the Red River 
as the bank was located and marked by the United States Army Corps 
of Engineers before the beginning of construction of Lake Texoma, in 
accordance with subsection C of Article II of Section 6106 of T itle 
74 of the Oklahoma Statu tes; 
3.  To redraw the boundary line between this state and the State 
of Texas on any real property for which the United States Army Corps 
of Engineers granted an easemen t, prior to August 31, 2000, to at 
least two districts or authorities created under Se ction 59 of 
Article XVI of the Texas Constitu tion for the construction, 
operation, and maintenance of a water pipeline and related 
facilities in the Texoma Area in order to negate any effects the 
boundary as it is currently dra wn has on property interests 
associated with such easements in the Texoma Area, and to redraw the   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1546 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
boundary on such real property so that there is no net loss of 
property between either state so as to ensure that the redrawn 
boundary does not increase the p olitical power or influence o f 
either state, in accordance with: 
a. the Lake Texoma preconstruction survey of the south 
bank of the Red River prepared by the United States 
Army Corps of Engineers, o r 
b. other historical records or documentation of the 
United States Army Corps of Engin eers identifying the 
location of the south ba nk of the Red River, if the 
survey described by subparagraph a of this paragraph 
is unavailable; 
4.  To hold hearings and conferences in this state and in the 
State of Texas as neces sary to accomplish the purpos es of this act 
Section 6110 et seq. of this title ; and 
5.  To take other action, alone or in cooperation with the State 
of Texas or the United States, necessary to accomplish the purposes 
of this act Section 6110 et seq. of this title . 
B.  No later than January 15, 2022 January 15, 2023, the 
Commission shall repo rt to the Governor, the Lieutenant Governor, 
the President Pro Tempore of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of 
Representatives, and appropriate committees of the Legislature the 
Commission’s findings and recommendations concerning joint action by 
this state and the State of Texas regarding the amendment of the   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1546 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Texoma Area Boundary Agreement to incorporate the boundar y between 
this state and the State of Texas in the Texoma Area as redrawn .  No 
later than July 30, 2025 July 30, 2026, the Commission shall issue a 
final report to the Governor, the Lieutenant Governor, the President 
Pro Tempore of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of 
Representatives, and appropriate committees of the Legislature. 
SECTION 3.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2022. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON RULES 
March 2, 2022 - DO PASS