Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1549 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/20/2022

                     
 
 
Req. No. 3233 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) 
 
SENATE BILL 1549 	By: Thompson 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to state agencies; requiring certain 
third-party evaluation of agenc y processes; requiring 
report upon completion of evaluation; directing 
distribution of report; providing for codification; 
and providing an effective date . 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHO MA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 80.2 of Title 74, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  No later than July 1, 2023, a ll state agencies, 
institutions, or political subdivi sions shall choose and co ntract 
with a third-party evaluator on the Oklahoma Statewide Contracts to 
perform a thorough evalu ation and report of the individual agency’s 
document lifecycle needs and costs, inclusive of digital forms, 
workflow and eProcesses , storage, retrieval, destruction, and 
digital auditing. 
B.  Upon completion of the th ird-party evaluation, each agency 
shall submit the reported findings and any subsequent actions taken   
 
 
Req. No. 3233 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
by the agency to improve efficiency and prod uctivity, while reduci ng 
overall cost through technological improvements to the President Pro 
Tempore of the Oklahoma State Senate and to the Speaker of the 
Oklahoma House of Representatives no later than November 1, 2023. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effectiv e November 1, 2022. 
 
58-2-3233 BG  1/20/2022 10:24:33 AM