Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1549 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/07/2022

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1549 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
March 3, 2022 
AS AMENDED 
 
SENATE BILL NO. 1549 	By: Thompson of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Phillips of the House 
 
 
 
[ state agencies - third-party evaluation of agenc y 
processes - codification - effective date ] 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHO MA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 80.2 of Title 74, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  No later than July 1, 2023, all state agencies, 
institutions, or political subdivi sions shall choose and co ntract 
with a third-party evaluator on the Oklahoma Statewide Contracts to 
perform a thorough evalu ation and report of the individual agency’s 
document lifecycle needs and costs, inclusive of digital forms, 
workflow and eProcesses , storage, retrieval, destruction, and 
digital auditing. 
B.  Upon completion of the th ird-party evaluation, each agency 
shall submit the reported findings and any subsequent acti ons taken 
by the agency to improve efficiency and prod uctivity, while reduci ng 
overall cost through technological improvements to the President Pro   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1549 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Tempore of the Senate and to the Speaker of the House of 
Representatives no later than November 1, 2023. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effectiv e November 1, 2022. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS 
March 3, 2022 - DO PASS AS AMENDED