Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1601 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/20/2022

                     
 
 
Req. No. 2726 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) 
 
SENATE BILL 1601 	By: Rader 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to county employee pension funding; 
amending 19 O.S. 2021, Sections 954 , 957-1, 960, and 
961, which relate to maximum contributions for 
certain entities and payment of certain employer 
contributions from court funds ; authorizing a one-
time lump sum contribution in certain circumstances; 
modifying amount county and court fund may pay into 
county retirement system; modifying l imit of certain 
total contribution; deleting obsolete language; 
updating statutory reference; clarifying language; 
providing an effective date; and declaring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     19 O.S. 2021, Section 954, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 954. It shall be the mandatory duty of the board of 
county commissioners of any county esta blishing a retirement fund 
and system to appropriate annually, for t he sole use of the 
retirement fund within its general fund and subject to the approval 
of the county excise board, a sum which shall be equal to or exceed 
the contributions made to the ret irement fund by the employees.  
Such appropriation shall not exceed the sum of the current annual   
 
 
Req. No. 2726 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
salaries of all employees to be covered in the following 
percentages: 
July 1, 2007 – June 30, 2008 13 1/2% 
July 1, 2008 – June 30, 2009 14 1/2% 
July 1, 2009 – June 30, 2010 15 1/2% 
July 1, 2010 – June 30, 2019 16 1/2% 
July 1, 2019 - June 30, 2020 
and each year thereafter 18 1/2% 
Beginning July 1, 2019, the total employer and employee 
contributions shall not exceed eighteen and one -half percent (18.5%) 
of the monthly compensation of each member.  The governing body of 
the participating employers listed in this section may vary the 
percentage contribution of the employer and employee, provided the 
total percentage contributed by the employer and employee equals th e 
total percentage contribution required by this section.  Payment o f 
such shall be paid to the fund upon verifie d claims by the treasurer 
of the fund approved by the board of trustees and attested by its 
clerk.  For any contribution made on or after July 1, 2021, to June 
30, 2022, of less than eighteen and one-half percent (18.5%), an 
employer may retroactively make a one -time lump sum contribution of 
an amount equal to the difference between the actual total 
contribution that was made and the total contri bution amount equal 
to eighteen and one-half percent (18.5%).   
 
 
Req. No. 2726 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 2.     AMENDATORY     19 O.S. 2021, Section 957 -1, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 957-1. The county commissioners of any county establishing 
a drainage district or districts, an d establishing a county 
retirement system, in addi tion to the duties and authority now 
provided by law, are hereby authorized to pay into the retirement 
system of such county for the use and benefit o f the employees 
eligible for retirement benefits, such a mounts as the said board of 
county commissioners m ay authorize by resolution not exceeding the 
current annual salaries of all employees to be covered in the 
following percentages: 
July 1, 2009 - June 30, 2010 	15 1/2% 
July 1, 2010 - June 30, 2011 
and each year thereafter 	16 1/2% 
Beginning July 1, 2009, the total employer and employee 
contributions shall not exceed sixteen and one -half percent (16.5%) 
of the monthly compensation of each member.  Provided further, that 
drainage district employees becoming qual ified by this act shall be 
credited as to eligibil ity for the full time of their county 
employment; and, provided further, in the event of retroactive 
eligibility such employees shall be required to p ay into the 
retirement system fund an amount equal to th at which would have 
otherwise been paid by such em ployees in order to gain credit for 
such time of employment.  whose salaries are paid either in whole or   
 
 
Req. No. 2726 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
in part out of the drainage district funds.  The total employer and 
employee contributions shall not exceed the percentages of the 
monthly compensation of each member set forth in Section 954 of this 
title. 
SECTION 3.     AMENDATORY     19 O.S. 2021, Section 960, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 960. A. In addition to all other i tems which are now 
or may hereafter be authorized to be paid from the court fund, it 
shall be the mandatory duty of the governing board of the court fund 
to pay annually for the sole use of the retirement system a sum 
equal to the contributions made to the retirement fund by the 
employees, but not to exce ed the following percentages of the 
current annual salaries , established in Section 954 of this title, 
of all employees whose salaries are paid eit her in whole or in part 
out of the court funds of such coun ty:. 
July 1, 2009 - June 30, 2010 	15 1/2% 
July 1, 2010 - June 30, 2011 
and each year thereafter 	16 1/2% 
Beginning July 1, 2009, the total employer and empl oyee 
contributions shall not exceed sixteen and one-half percent (16.5%) 
of the monthly compensation of each member.  The total employer and 
employee contributions shall not exceed the percentages of the 
monthly compensation of each member set forth in Sec tion 954 of this 
title.    
 
 
Req. No. 2726 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
B. It shall be the mandatory duty of the gove rning board of the 
court fund to pay annually from the court fund to a county 
retirement system which is not a participant in the Oklaho ma Public 
Employees Retirement System, the employ er's contribution for that 
court reporter who pursuant to the provision s of Section 106.8 of 
Title 20 of the Oklahoma Statutes , exercised his or her option to 
continue as a member of the county retirement sy stem following 
January 13, 1969.  The contributio ns to be so paid shall be limited 
to the amount provided for in subsect ion A of this section.  The 
provisions of this subsection shall operate retroact ively to take 
effect on and after January 13, 1969. 
SECTION 4.     AMENDATORY     19 O.S. 2021, Section 961, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 961. In addition to all other items whi ch are now or 
may hereafter be authorized to be pa id from the Law Library Fund, it 
shall be the mandatory duty of the trustee s of the Law Library Fund 
to pay annually for the sole use of the retirement system a sum 
equal to the contributions made to the Retirement Fund retirement 
fund by the employees, bu t not to exceed the following percentages 
of the current annual salaries , established in Section 954 of this 
title, of all employees whose salaries are paid either in whole or 
in part out of the Law Library Fund of such county.: 
July 1, 2009 - June 30, 2010 	15 1/2%   
 
 
Req. No. 2726 	Page 6  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
July 1, 2010 - June 30, 2011 
and each year thereafter 	16 1/2% 
Beginning July 1, 20 09, the total employer and employee 
contributions shall not exceed sixteen and one -half percent (16.5%) 
of the monthly compensation of each member .  The total employer and 
employee contributions shall not exceed the percentages of the 
monthly compensation of each member set forth in Section 95 4 of this 
title. 
SECTION 5.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2022. 
SECTION 6.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by r eason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
58-2-2726 RJ 1/20/2022 2:14:19 PM