Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1794 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/20/2022

                     
 
 
Req. No. 3362 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) 
 
SENATE BILL 1794 	By: Dahm 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to nuclear energy; directing 
Department of Environmental Quality conduct study on 
feasibility and establishment of nuclear facilities; 
requiring findings of study be reported to certain 
state officials; providing for codification; and 
providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA : 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 2-9-111 of Title 27A, unless 
there is created a duplication in numb ering, reads as follows : 
On or before January 1, 2024, the Department of Environmental 
Quality, in coordination with the O ffice of the Secretary of Energy 
and Environment, shall conduct a study pursuant to th is section.  
The study shall focus on the feasibility and establishment of 
nuclear facilities located in this state.  Th e study shall also 
include the state requirements as specified by United States Nuclear 
Regulatory Commission and any method of federal agency approval.  
The Department shall issue a report based on the findings of the 
study and shall include any recommend ations for the establishment of   
 
 
Req. No. 3362 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
a facility.  The report shall be delivered to the Governor, the 
Secretary of Energy and E nvironment, the President Pro Tempore of 
the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, the Chair 
of the Senate Energy Commit tee, and the Chair of the House Energy 
and Natural Resources Committee no later tha n February 1, 2024. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2022. 
 
58-2-3362 RJ 1/20/2022 7:20:32 PM