Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB252 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/04/2021

                     
 
 
Req. No. 717 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
SENATE BILL 252 	By: Stanley 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to schools; amending Section 1, 
Chapter 332, O.S.L. 2019 (70 O.S. Sup p. 2020, Section 
11-103.6m), which relates to compu ter science 
programs in schools; requiring public schools to 
offer certain computer science course or instruction 
by certain school year; directing computer science 
courses or offerings to meet certain requirements; 
requiring public schools to submit certa in annual 
report by certain date; directing the State 
Department of Education to post on its website 
certain report information; and providing an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.    AMENDATORY     Section 1, Chapter 332, O.S.L. 
2019 (70 O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 11 -103.6m), is amended to read as 
follows: 
Section 11-103.6m. A.  The State Department of Education shall 
develop by December 31, 2019, a rubric for computer science prog rams 
in elementary, middle and high schools to serve as a guide to 
schools for implementing quali ty computer science programs. 
B.  The rubric shall include but not be limited to the following 
recommendations:   
 
 
Req. No. 717 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
1.  No less than one computer science course ta ught by a teacher 
with a computer science certification at each school site, which may 
include core content courses where computer science concepts are 
integrated; and 
2.  Allowing all students to have acc ess to career exploration 
activities that address h ow computer science skills are utilized. 
C.  1. Beginning in the 2024 -2025 school year, all public high 
schools and public charter high schools in this state shall offer a 
minimum of one computer science course to students. 
2.  Beginning in the 2024 -2025 school year, all public middle 
schools and public charter middle schools in this state shall offer 
instruction in exploratory computer science content. 
3.  Beginning in the 2024-2025 school year, all publi c 
elementary schools and public charter elementary schools shall offer 
instruction in the basics of computer science content and 
computational thinking. 
D. Each course or offering required by subsection C of this 
section shall be: 
1.  Be aligned to the Oklahoma Academic Standards for Computer 
Science and current research-based instructional practices ; 
2.  Be of high quality, as defined by the State Board of 
Education; and   
 
 
Req. No. 717 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
3.  Be offered in an in -person setting or as a virtual or 
distance course option only when a traditional clas sroom setting is 
not feasible. 
D.  The provisions of this section shall not be construed to 
mean that courses may not be taught in a virtual, distance, 
integrated or other innovative se tting. 
E.  By June 30, 2025, and by June 30 eac h year thereafter, each 
school district and public charter school shall submit to the State 
Department of Education a report regarding computer science courses 
or content offered during the previous school yea r. The report 
shall include: 
1.  The names and course codes of computer science courses 
offered in each school including a course d escription and which 
Oklahoma Academic Standard s for Computer Science are covered, to the 
extent such information is available; 
2.  The number and per centage of students who enrolled in each 
computer science course disaggr egated by: 
a. gender, 
b. race and ethnicity, 
c. special education status including whether a student 
is on an individualize d education program pursuant to 
the Individuals with Disabili ties Education Act (IDEA) 
or a Section 504 Plan as defined by the Rehabi litation 
Act of 1973, P.L. No. 93-112,   
 
 
Req. No. 717 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
d. eligibility for free or reduced -price meals under the 
National School Lunch A ct, and 
e. grade level; and 
3.  The number of computer science te achers at each school 
disaggregated by: 
a. gender, 
b. race and ethnicity, 
c. highest academic degree attained, and 
d. subject area of teacher certification, if applicable. 
F.  The State Department of Educat ion shall post on its website 
the reports received pursuant to subsecti on E of this section . 
1.  Information submitted pur suant to paragraphs 1 and 2 of 
subsection E of this section shall be disaggregated by school prior 
to being posted online; and 
2.  Information submitted pursuant to paragraph 3 of subsection 
E of this section shall be posted online in aggregate statewide 
form. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
 
58-1-717 EB 1/4/2021 3:34:27 PM