Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB379 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/12/2021

                     
 
 
Req. No. 532 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
SENATE BILL 379 	By: David 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to individual income tax retur ns; 
amending 68 O.S. 2011, Section 2368.1 2, as last 
amended by Section 1, Chapter 92, O.S.L. 2018 (68 
O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 2368.12), which relates to 
donation from tax refund; reauthorizing certain 
donation; and providing an effective date . 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2011, Section 2368.12, as 
last amended by Section 1, Chapter 92, O.S.L. 2018 (68 O.S. Supp. 
2020, Section 2368.12), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 2368.12. A.  Each state indivi dual income tax return 
form for tax years which beg in after December 31, 2003, and each 
state corporate tax return form for tax years beginning after 
December 31, 2003, shall contain a provision to allow a donation 
from a tax refund for the benefit of prog rams to recruit, train, and 
supervise volunteers as Court Appointed Special Advocates, as 
follows:   
 
 
Req. No. 532 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Support of programs for volunteers to act as Court Appointed 
Special Advocates for abused or neglected children.  Check if you 
wish to donate from your tax r efund:  ( ) $2, ( ) $5, or ( ) $____. 
B.  Except as otherwise provided for in this section, all monies 
generated pursuant to subsection A of this section shall be paid to 
the State Treasurer by the Oklahoma Tax Commiss ion and placed to the 
credit of the Income Tax Checkoff Revolving Fund for Court Appointe d 
Special Advocates created in subsection C of this section. 
C.  There is hereby created in the State Treasury a revolving 
fund for the Office of the Attorney General to be designated the 
“Income Tax Checkoff Revolving Fund for Court Appointed Special 
Advocates”.  The fund shall be a continuing fund, not s ubject to 
fiscal year limitations, and shall consist of all monies apportioned 
to the fund pursuant to the provision s of this section.  All monies 
accruing to the credit of the fund are hereby appropriated and shall 
be budgeted and expended by the Office o f the Attorney General for 
the purpose of providing grants to the Oklahoma CASA Association for 
the purpose of provi ding support for Court Appointed Speci al 
Advocates for abused and neglected children.  Ex penditures from the 
fund shall be made upon warrant s issued by the State Treasurer 
against claims filed as prescribed by law with the Director of the 
Office of State Finance for approval and payment. 
D.  If a taxpayer makes a donation pursuant to subsectio n A of 
this section in error, the taxpayer may file a claim for refund at   
 
 
Req. No. 532 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
any time within three (3) years from the due date of the tax return.  
Such claims shall be fi led pursuant to the provisions of Sect ion 
2373 of this title.  Prior to the apportionment set forth in this 
section, an amount equal to the total amount of refunds made 
pursuant to this subsection during any one (1) year shall be 
deducted from the total do nations received pursuant to this sect ion 
during the following year and such amount deduc ted shall be paid to 
the State Treasurer and placed to the credit of the Income Tax 
Withholding Refund Account. 
E.  Pursuant to Section 2368.18 of this title, the inco me tax 
checkoff contained in this sect ion is hereby reauthorized effective 
January 1, 2018 January 1, 2022. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective January 1, 2022. 
 
58-1-532 QD 1/12/2021 11:01:18 PM