Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB405 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/23/2021

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB405 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
February 22, 2021 
 
 
SENATE BILL NO. 405 	By: Stanley of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Roe of the House 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to midwifery; amending Section 5, 
Chapter 40, O.S.L. 2020 (59 O.S. Su pp. 2020, Section 
3040.5), which relates to the Advisory Committee on 
Midwifery; clarifying appointment procedure and terms 
of members; removing inapplicable reference; and 
providing an effective date . 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE O F OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.    AMENDATORY     Section 5, Chapter 40, O.S.L. 2020 
(59 O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 3040.5), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 3040.5. A.  There is hereby created, to continue until 
July 1, 2026, in accordance with the provisions of the Oklahoma 
Sunset Law, an Advisory Committee on Midwifery, which shall consist 
of seven (7) voting members to be appointed by the State 
Commissioner of Health as follows: 
1.  Three licensed midwives, each of whom has at least three (3) 
years of experience in the practice o f midwifery; 
2.  One Certified Nurse-Midwife;   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB405 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
3.  One physician who is certified by a nation al professional 
organization of physic ians that certifies obstetricians and 
gynecologists and supports the practice of mid wifery; 
4.  One physician who is certified by a national professional 
organization of physicians that certifies family practitioners o r 
pediatricians and supports the pract ice of midwifery; and 
5.  One member of the general public who is not practicing or 
trained in a health care profession, and w ho is a parent with at 
least one child born with the assistance of a licensed midwife or a 
Certified Nurse-Midwife. 
B.  Members of the Committee shall serve for staggered terms of 
six (6) years.  The terms of three members shall expire on January 
31 of each odd-numbered year be divided into three classes.  The 
initial terms of the first c lass shall expire on January 31, 2023, 
and subsequent terms shall expire on January 31 of each sixth year 
thereafter.  The initial terms of the second class shall expire on 
January 31, 2025, and subsequent terms shall expire on January 31 of 
each sixth year thereafter.  The initial terms of the third class 
shall expire on January 31, 2027, and subsequent terms shall expire 
on January 31 of each sixth year thereafter. Members shall serve 
until a qualified successor has been duly appointe d.  The 
Commissioner shall fill a vacancy no later than sixty (60 ) days from 
the date the vacancy occurs.  No person shall be appointed to serve 
more than two (2) consecutive terms.   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB405 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
C.  The Committee shall annually elect a chair and vice -chair 
from among its members. 
D.  The Committee shall meet at least semiannually an d at any 
other time at the call of the chair or the Commissioner. 
E.  The Committee shall meet in accordance with the Oklahoma 
Open Meeting Act. 
F.  A majority of the members of the Committee including at 
least two licensed midwives, shall constitute a quo rum for the 
conduct of Committee business. 
G.  1.  The Committee shall advise the Co mmissioner on all 
matters pertaining to mid wifery including but not limited to: 
a. scope and standards of p ractice, 
b. licensure requirements, examination requirements, 
exceptions thereto, renewal requirements, temporary 
licensure and endorsement or recipr ocity requirements, 
c. methods and requirem ents for ensuring the continued 
competence of licensed and regis tered persons, 
including the type of courses and number of hours 
required to meet the basic midwifery education course 
and continuing midwifery educa tion course 
requirements, and instructors o r facilities used in 
the basic and continuing education requirem ents,   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB405 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
d. procedures for reporting of outcomes including, but 
not limited to, live births and fetal, newborn or 
maternal deaths, 
e. grounds for reporting and processing complaints, 
violations, probation, revocation or suspension of 
license or reinstatement provisions, and 
f. all other matters which may pertain to the pra ctice of 
midwifery. 
2.  The Committee shall review and make recommendations to the 
Commissioner on all applications for licensu re. 
3.  The Committee shall assist and advise the Commissioner i n 
all hearings related to the enforcement of Shepherd ’s Law.  The 
Committee shall review all complaints and make recommendations to 
the Commissioner on appropriate disciplinary action includin g, but 
not limited to, administrative fines, license revocation and license 
suspension. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES 
February 22, 2021 - DO PASS