ENGR. S. B. NO. 405 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 ENGROSSED SENATE BILL NO. 405 By: Stanley of the Senate and Roe of the House An Act relating to midwifery; amending Section 5, Chapter 40, O.S.L. 2020 (59 O.S. Su pp. 2020, Section 3040.5), which relates to the Advisory Committee on Midwifery; clarifying appointment procedure and terms of members; removing inapplicable reference; and providing an effective date . BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE O F OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY Section 5, Chapter 40, O.S.L. 2020 (59 O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 3040.5), is amended to read as follows: Section 3040.5. A. There is hereby created, to continue until July 1, 2026, in accordance with the provisions of the Oklahoma Sunset Law, an Advisory Committee on M idwifery, which shall consist of seven (7) voting members to be appointed by the State Commissioner of Health as follows: 1. Three licensed midwives, each of whom has at least three (3) years of experience in the practice o f midwifery; 2. One Certified Nurse-Midwife; 3. One physician who is certified by a nation al professional organization of physic ians that certifies obstetricians and gynecologists and supports the practice of mid wifery; ENGR. S. B. NO. 405 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 4. One physician who is certified by a national professional organization of physicians that certifies family practitioners o r pediatricians and supports the pract ice of midwifery; and 5. One member of the general public who is not practicing or trained in a health care profession, and w ho is a parent with at least one child born with the assistance of a licensed midwife or a Certified Nurse-Midwife. B. Members of the Committee shall serve for staggered terms of six (6) years. The terms of three members shall expire on January 31 of each odd-numbered year be divided into three classes. The initial terms of the first c lass shall expire on January 31, 2023, and subsequent terms shall expire on January 31 of each sixth year thereafter. The initial terms of the second class shall expire on January 31, 2025, and subsequent terms shall expire on January 31 of each sixth year thereafter. The initial terms of the third class shall expire on January 31, 2027, and subsequent terms shall expire on January 31 of each sixth year thereafter. Members shall serve until a qualified successor has been duly appointed. The Commissioner shall fill a vacancy no later than sixty (60 ) days from the date the vacancy occurs. No person shall be appointed to serve more than two (2) consecutive terms. C. The Committee shall annually elect a c hair and vice-chair from among its members. ENGR. S. B. NO. 405 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 D. The Committee shall meet at least semiannually an d at any other time at the call of the chair or the Commissioner. E. The Committee shall meet in accordance with the Oklahoma Open Meeting Act. F. A majority of the members of the Committee including at least two licensed midwives, shall constitute a quo rum for the conduct of Committee business. G. 1. The Committee shall advise the Co mmissioner on all matters pertaining to mid wifery including but not limited to: a. scope and standards of practice, b. licensure requirements, examination requirements, exceptions thereto, renewal requirements, temporary licensure and endorsement or recipr ocity requirements, c. methods and requirem ents for ensuring the continued competence of licensed and registered persons, including the type of courses and number of hours required to meet the basic midwifery education course and continuing midwifery educa tion course requirements, and instructors o r facilities used in the basic and continuing education requirements, d. procedures for reporting of outcomes including, but not limited to, live births and fetal, newborn or maternal deaths, ENGR. S. B. NO. 405 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 e. grounds for reporting and processing complaints, violations, probation, revocation or suspens ion of license or reinstatement provisions, and f. all other matters which may pertain to the pra ctice of midwifery. 2. The Committee shall review and make recommendations to the Commissioner on all applications for licensu re. 3. The Committee shall assi st and advise the Commissioner in all hearings related to the enforcement of Shepherd ’s Law. The Committee shall review all complaints and make recommendations to the Commissioner on appropriate disciplinary action includin g, but not limited to, administr ative fines, license revocation and license suspension. SECTION 2. This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. Passed the Senate the 2nd day of March, 2021. Presiding Officer of the Senate Passed the House of Representatives t he ____ day of __________, 2021. Presiding Officer of the House of Representatives