Req. No. 820 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 STATE OF OKLAHOMA 1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) SENATE BILL 409 By: Bergstrom AS INTRODUCED An Act relating to the Oklahoma Research and Development Incentive s Act; amending 68 O.S. 2011, Section 54003, which relates to sales and use tax exemption for qualified purchases; modifying time period during which specified exemption may be claimed; updating statutory reference; and providing an effective date. BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 68 O.S. 2011, Section 54003, is amended to read as follows: Section 54003. A. There are hereby specifically exempted from the taxes levied by Section 1354 a nd Section 1402 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes this title sales of qualified purchases made after July 1, 1992, and before January 1, 2022, to a qualified purchaser which is primarily engaged in computer services and data processing as defined under Industria l Group Numbers 7372, 7373, 7374 and 7375 of the SIC Manual, latest revision, or a quali fied purchaser which is primarily engaged in research and development as defined under Industrial Group Numbers 8731, 8732, 8733 and 8734 of the SIC Manual, latest revision. Req. No. 820 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 B. A qualified purchaser which is primarily engaged in computer services and data processing as defined under Industrial Group Number 7374 of the SIC Manual, latest revision, shall be required to have a minimum of One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($100, 000.00) in qualified purchases in order to be eligi ble to receive the exemption provided for in this section. C. In order to be eligible to receive the exemption provided for in this section, a new or expanding business shall not include the existing employee positions of any business enterprise that is directly or beneficially owned by a co rporation, trust, joint venture, proprietorship, or partnership doing business in this state as of January 1, 1992. D. Eligibility to receive the exemption provided fo r in this subsection pursuant to the requirement to derive fifty percent (50%) of revenues from out-of-state buyers or consumers and pursuant to the requirement that the business be primarily engaged in computer services and data processing or in research and development shall be established, subject to re view by the Oklahoma Tax Commission, by annually filing an affidavit with the Oklahoma Tax Commission stating that the business so qualifies and such other information as required by the Commission. For p urposes of determining whether annual gross revenue s are derived from sales to out -of-state buyers or consumers, all sales to the federal government shall be considered to be sales to an out -of-state buyer or consumer. Req. No. 820 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 SECTION 2. This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 58-1-820 QD 1/14/2021 9:40:04 PM