Req. No. 1695 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 STATE OF OKLAHOMA 1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR SENATE BILL 409 By: Bergstrom COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE An Act relating to the Oklahoma Research and Development Incentives Act; amending 68 O.S. 2011, Sections 54003 and 54004, which relate to the exemption of sales and use taxes for qualified purchases; modifying time period during which specified exemption may be claimed; modifying time period during which qual ified purchase may be eligible for refund; updating statutory references; and providing an effective date . BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF TH E STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 68 O.S. 2011, Section 54003, is amended to read as follows: Section 54003. A. There are hereby specifically exempted from the taxes levied by Section 1354 and Section 1402 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes this title sales of qualified purchases made after July 1, 1992, and before Jan uary 1, 2022, to a qualified purchaser which is primarily engaged in computer services and data processing as defined under Industrial Group Numbers 7372, 7373, 7374 and 7375 of the SIC Manual, latest revision, or a quali fied purchaser which Req. No. 1695 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 is primarily engaged in research and development as define d under Industrial Group Numbers 8731, 8732, 8733 and 8734 of the SIC Manual, latest revision. B. A qualified purchaser which is primarily engaged in computer services and data processing as defined under Indust rial Group Number 7374 of the SIC Manual, la test revision, shall be required to have a minimum of One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($100,000.00) in qualified purchases in order to be eligible to receive the exemption provided for in this section. C. In order to be eligible to receive the exemption prov ided for in this section, a new or expanding business shall not include the existing employee positions of any business enterprise that is directly or beneficially owned by a co rporation, trust, joint venture, proprietorship, or partnership doing business in this state as of January 1, 1992. D. Eligibility to receive the exemption provided for in this subsection pursuant to the requirement to derive fifty percent (50%) of revenues from out-of-state buyers or cons umers and pursuant to the requirement that t he business be primarily engaged in computer services and data processing or in research and development shall be established, subject to review by the Oklahoma Tax Commission, by annually filing an affidavit wit h the Oklahoma Tax Commission stating that the business so qualifies and such other information as required by the Commission. For purposes of determining whether Req. No. 1695 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 annual gross revenues are derived from sales to out -of-state buyers or consumers, all sales to the federal government shall be considered to be sales to an out-of-state buyer or consumer. SECTION 2. AMENDATORY 68 O.S. 2011, Section 54004, is amended to read as follows: Section 54004. A. In order to administer the exemp tion for sales to a qualified computer servi ces, data processing or r esearch and development facility as provided by Section 7 of this act Section 54003 of this title , there shall be made a sales tax refund for state and local sales taxes paid by the accou nt created by this section to such qualified facility. B. The Oklahoma Tax Commission shall tran sfer each month from sales tax collected the amount which the Commission estimates to be necessary to make the sales tax refund provided by this section to an account designated as the Commission determi nes. C. Any refund shall be paid from the account pr escribed by this section at the time the claim for refund is approved by the Oklahoma Tax Commission. The amount of the refund shall not exceed the total state and local sales taxes paid together with a ccrued interest upon such total. The amount of inter est paid to a qualified computer services, data processing or research and development facility upon the principal amount of any refund made to such qualified facility for purposes of administering the e xemption provided by Section 7 of this act Section 54003 of this title , shall be determined according Req. No. 1695 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 to the provisions of this subsection. For any month during which the Oklahoma Tax Commission transfers a sum to the account prescribed by subsection B of this section, the Commission shall determine an interest rate by determining the rate of interest paid for a three-month Treasury Bill of the United States government as of the first working day of the month in which the transfer is made. The interest rate so determined shall accrue upon the amount transferred to the account. In eac h subsequent month, the Commission shall determine the interest rate paid for a three -month Treasury Bill of the United States gove rnment as of the first working day of the mo nth and such interest rate shall accrue upon any amount transferred during the mo nth and upon the amounts previously transferred to the account together with interest previously accrued upon such amounts. D. For purposes of this section, state and local s ales taxes paid by a contractor or subcontractor for qualified purchases as defined in Section 6 of this act Section 54002 of this title , purchased by that contractor or subcontractor pursuant to a contract with a qualified computer services, d ata processing or research and development facility shall, upon proper showing, be refunded to such qualified facility. E. The qualified computer services, data processing or research and development facility shall file wit h the Oklahoma Tax Commission the following documentation for any refund claimed: Req. No. 1695 Page 5 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1. Invoices indicating the amount of state and local sales tax billed; 2. Affidavit of each vendor that state and local sales tax billed has not been audited, rebated, or r efunded to such qualified facility but rather the sales tax charged has been collected by the vendor and remitted to the Oklahoma Tax Commission; and 3. All additional documentation required to be submitted pursuant to rules promulgated by the Oklahoma Ta x Commission. F. In the event that state and local sales tax was paid by a contractor or subcontractor, the qualified computer services, data processing or research and development facility shall file with the Oklahoma Tax Commission all documentation req uired in subsection E of this section but in lieu of the affidavit of each vendor the qualified facility shall file, for any refund claimed, an affidavit from the contractor or subcontractor stating that the sales tax refund of the qualified facility is ba sed on state and local sales tax paid by the contractor or subcontractor on qualified purchases as defined in Section 6 of this act Section 54002 of this title , purchased and that t he amount of state and local sales tax claimed was paid to the vendor and n o credit, refund, or rebate has been claimed by the contractor or subcontractor. G. Only sales of qualified purchases as defined in Section 6 of this act Section 54002 of this title , made after July 1, 1992 , and Req. No. 1695 Page 6 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 before January 1, 2022 , shall be eligible for the refund established by this section. H. The qualified computer services, data processing or research and development facility shall file, within thirty -six (36) months of the date of the first purchase which is exempt from taxatio n pursuant to the provisions of Section 7 of this act Section 54003 of this title, with the Oklahoma Tax Commission a certification issued by the Employment Security Commission in order to qualify for the refund authorized by this section. I. Notwithstanding the provisions of any state tax law, the amount refunded under this section shall be assessed if the number of new full-time-equivalent employees drops below the number prescribed in Section 6 of this act Section 54002 of this title, at any time within thirty -six (36) months of the date certification i s issued by the Oklahoma Employment Security Commission. SECTION 3. This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 58-1-1695 QD 2/18/2021 4:45:19 PM