Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB425 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/15/2021

                     
 
 
Req. No. 1179 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
SENATE BILL 425 	By: Hamilton 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to human trafficking and child 
exploitation; creating the Advisory Task Force on 
Prevention of Human Trafficking and Child 
Exploitation; providing for membership and 
appointments; stating duty to study hum an 
trafficking, prostitution and child exploitation in 
Oklahoma; providing for recommendations and report; 
stating member appointment and initial meeting dates; 
setting term for task force; providing travel 
reimbursements; exempting advisory task force from 
Open Meetings Act; providing for noncodification; 
providing an effective date; and dec laring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF O KLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law not to be 
codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: 
There is hereby created an Advisory Task Force on Prevention of 
Human Trafficking and Child Exploitation.  There shall be thirteen 
(13) members on the Advisory Task Force as follows: 
1.  The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, 
or a designee; 
2. The Oklahoma County District Attorney, or a designee; 
3. The Attorney General, or a designee;   
 
 
Req. No. 1179 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
4. Two members appointed by the President Pro Tempore of t he 
Senate who shall represent a victim assistance organization , a human 
trafficking prevention advocate or a member -at-large; 
5. Two members appointed by the Speaker of the House of 
Representatives who shall represent a child protection or child 
advocacy organization, a local law enforcement agency or a faith-
based organization; 
6. Three Senators appointed by the President Pro Tempore of the 
Senate; and 
7. Three Representatives appointed by the Speaker of the Ho use 
of Representatives. 
The Advisory Task Force shall have the duty to study human 
trafficking, prostitution and child exploitation in Oklahoma. The 
Advisory Task Force shall make recommendations to the Legislature on 
methods and laws to enhance and fund the efforts of law enforcement 
and/or community groups that are working to slow and stop 
prostitution, human trafficking or child exploitation; methods to 
assist in identifying and interrupting websites that promote 
pornography and sexually ex plicit materials; and methods that 
develop and support community groups working with victims to 
interrupt cycles of abuse or prevent human trafficking, 
prostitution, sexual abuse or other factors influential in 
perpetuating human trafficking, prostitution o r child exploitation.   
 
 
Req. No. 1179 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
The Advisory Task Force shall have members appointed by August 
1, 2021. The Advisory Task Force shall begin meeting and continue 
studying until January 1, 2022.  A report of the findings a nd 
recommendations shall be presented to the P resident Pro Tempore of 
the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Representat ives and the 
Governor on or before February 1, 2022.  Upon delivery of the report 
the Advisory Task Force shall terminate. 
Members of the Legislature shall receive travel reimburseme nts 
from their respective appointing au thority.  The Senate and House 
staff shall jointly assist in staffing the Advisory Task Force. A 
Senate member shall call the initial meeting by September 1, 2021.  
The chair of the Advisory Task Force shall be appointed by majority 
vote of the members. 
The Advisory Task Force shall be exempt from the Oklahoma Open 
Meeting Act. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2021. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservati on 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof thi s act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
58-1-1179 NP 1/15/2021 3:26:12 PM