Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB683 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/23/2021

                    RBS No. 528 
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB683 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
February 22, 2021 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
SENATE BILL NO. 683 	By: Kidd  
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to teachers’ retirement; amending 70 
O.S. 2011, Section 17-103, as amended by Section 1, 
Chapter 141, O.S.L. 2019 ( 70 O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 
17-103), which relates to membership in the Teachers’ 
Retirement System of Oklahoma; modifying requirement 
for nonclassified optional personnel to join System; 
removing requirement for permitting certain 
contributions; authorizing certain nonclassified 
optional personnel to join System upon hiring; 
updating statutory language ; specifying procedures 
for nonclassified optional personnel to join or opt 
out of System; specifying certain required 
contributions be made by certain employees and 
employers; construing provision; specifying election 
to opt out of System be permanent; providing 
exception; and requiring nonclassified optional 
personnel make certain electi on to participate in 
System. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF TH E STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     70 O.S. 2011, Section 17 -103, as 
amended by Section 1, Chapter 141, O.S.L. 2019 (70 O.S. Supp. 2020, 
Section 17-103), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 17-103. Except as provided in the Alternat e Retirement 
Plan for Comprehensive Universities Act, the membership of the 
retirement system shall consist of the following:  RBS No. 528 
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB683 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
(1) A. All classified personnel shall become members of the 
retirement system as a condition of their employment; 
(2)  All B.  For the period from August 2, 1969 to the effective 
date of this act, all full-time nonclassified optional personnel 
regularly employed for more than one (1) year may join the Teachers’ 
Retirement System of Oklahoma subject to the rules and regulations 
adopted pursuant to this act.  Subject to the outcome of the private 
letter ruling request (2003) submitted by the Board of Trustees to 
the Internal Revenue S ervice (2001), the retirement system shall 
permit eligible nonclassified optional personnel who have ce ased to 
make otherwise required employee contributions after having made an 
election to become a member of the retirement system to resume 
employee contributions.  No service shall be credited to any such 
member for any period of time during which employee contributions 
were not made; the Teachers' Retirement System .  On or after the 
effective date of this act, all nonclassified optional personnel 
regularly employed for twenty (20) hours o r more per week may join 
the System upon hiring, subject to the provisions of subsection C of 
this section and the rules and regulations adopted by the System 
pursuant to this act . 
(3)  All persons who shall become classified personnel or who 
are regularly employed in any school system as new classified 
personnel after July 1, 1943, hereof, shall become members of the 
retirement system as a condition of their employment;  RBS No. 528 
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB683 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
(4)  All other regular school employees may join the Teachers ’ 
Retirement System su bject to the rules and regulations as may be 
adopted by the Board of Trus tees of the Teachers’ Retirement System; 
C.  1.  A nonclassified optional employee shall have thirty (30) 
days from the initial date of hire to make a one -time irrevocable 
written election to opt out of participation in the System.  If an 
eligible employee fails to make an election within the thirty-day 
period, the eligible employee shall be deemed to participate in the 
System. 
2.  If an eligible employee elects to opt out of participati on 
in the System, the employee shall not make any required employee 
contributions to the System and his or her employer shall not make 
any required employer contributions to the System . 
3.  If an eligible nonclassified optional employee elects to 
participate in the System, the employee shall make employee 
contributions to the System pursuant to Section 17-116.2 of this 
title and the employer shall make employer contributions to the 
System pursuant to Secti on 17-108.1 of this title.  Nothing in this 
paragraph shall be construed to prohibit the employer from making 
the contribution of the employee to the System on behalf of the 
employee. 
4.  A nonclassified optional employee who op ts out of 
participation in the System shall be ineligible for future 
participation in the System; provided, however, that if the employee  RBS No. 528 
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB683 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
is hired for a classified position, he or she shall be come a member 
of the System pursuant to subsection A of this section but shall not 
be eligible for prior service credit for service performed while 
employed in a nonclassified position during which the employee opte d 
out of participation in the System. 
5.  Any nonclassified optional employee employed on the 
effective date of this act shall make an irrevocable written 
election to participate in or opt out of the System pursuant to 
paragraph 1 of this subsection.  If the employee fails to make an 
election within thirty (30) days from the effective date of this 
act, the employee shall be deemed to participate in the System , 
subject to the provisions of paragraph 3 of this subsection. 
(5) D.  The Board of Trustees may, in its discretion, deny the 
right to become members to any class of members whose compensation 
is only partly paid by the state, or who is serving on a temporary 
or other than per annum basis, and it also may, in its discretion, 
make optional with members in any such class their individual 
entrance into the retirement system ;. 
(6) E. Should any member, with less than ten (10) years of 
teaching service in Oklahoma, in any period of six (6 ) consecutive 
years after becoming a member be absent from service more than five 
(5) years, withdraw his or her con tributions, retire or die, he or 
she shall thereupon cease to be a member.  The provisions of this 
paragraph shall not apply to any member o f the Teachers’ Retirement  RBS No. 528 
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB683 SFLR 	Page 5 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
System who has been a member of such classes of military services as 
may be approved by t he Board of Trustees, until a period of one and 
one-half (1 1/2) years from date of termination of such service 
shall have elapsed; and. 
(7) F. Effective November 1, 2019, a retired member of the 
Teachers’ Retirement System who becomes employed by the State 
Department of Education for the first time on or after November 1, 
2019, shall have the option to remain a member of the Teachers ’ 
Retirement System subject to any applicable limitations placed on 
retired members returning to work or may choose to participa te in 
the Oklahoma Public Employees Retirement System as an active member. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON RETIREMENT AND INSURANCE 
February 22, 2021 - DO PASS AS AMENDED