Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB998 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/25/2021

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB998 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendm ents)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
February 24, 2021 
AS AMENDED 
 
SENATE BILL NO. 998 	By: Standridge of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Osburn of the House 
 
 
 
 
 
[ Oklahoma Vehicle License and Registration Act - 
electronic certificates of title and associated liens 
- electronic documents and signatures - codification 
- effective date ] 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 1105A of Title 47, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  On or before July 1, 2022, the Oklahoma Tax Commission shall 
implement a program which will permit the electronic f iling, storage 
and delivery of motor vehicle certificates of title and allow a 
lienholder to perfect, assign and release a lien on a motor vehicle 
in lieu of submission and maintenance of paper documents as 
otherwise provided in the provisions of Section 1 101 et seq. of 
Title 47 of the Oklahoma Statutes. The Tax Commission shall 
designate a vendor or vendors, subject to the provisions of the 
Oklahoma Central Purchasing Act, Section 85.1 et seq. of Title 74 of   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB998 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendm ents)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
the Oklahoma Statutes, to provide necessary ha rdware, software and 
services to motor license agents who s hall provide an electronic 
filing, storage and delivery system to be used by applicants for a 
certificate of title and for filing or releasing a lien pursu ant to 
the procedures prescribed by the Ok lahoma Tax Commission. The 
provisions of this section shal l apply to applications for 
certificates of title and liens filed after June 30, 2022. The Tax 
Commission shall promulgate rules to implement the provi sions of 
this section. 
B.  The program authoriz ed under subsection A of this section 
shall include, but not be limited to, procedures: 
1.  For the delivery of a certificate of title, on a paper 
document or in an electronic format, to the secured party having the 
primary perfected security interest i n a vehicle in lieu of delivery 
to the record owner, notwith standing the provisions of Section 1101 
et seq. of Title 47 of the Oklahoma Statutes. Provided, when 
electronic transmission of liens and lien satisfactions is used, a 
certificate of title need not b e issued or printed until the last 
lien is satisfied and a clear certificate of title is issued to the 
owner of the vehicle at their request; 
2.  Establishing qualifications for third -party service 
providers offering electronic lien services ;   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB998 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendm ents)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
3.  Establishing reasonable fees, if necessary, to be charged by 
service providers or contractors for the es tablishment, maintenance 
and operation of the electronic lien title program ; 
4.  Providing access to the electronic certificate of title 
records including liens on record, for licensed motor vehicle 
dealers and lienholders who participate in the program 
notwithstanding the provisions of Section 1109 of Title 47 of the 
Oklahoma Statutes; 
5.  Allowing motor license a gents to participate in the 
electronic lien title program; and 
6.  For the acceptance and use of electroni c or digital 
signatures. 
C.  As used in this section and Section 1101 et seq. of Title 47 
of the Oklahoma Stat utes: 
1.  “Deliver” or “delivery” means, with respect to a certificate 
of title or lien, either the physical delivery of a paper document 
or the electronic delivery of a document in an electronic format; 
2.  “Electronic format” means an electronic or digital format or 
medium of any document, record or other information; an d 
3.  “Possess” or “possession” means, with respect to a 
certificate of title or lien, to hold or otherwise exercise control 
over a document which is in either a physical or electronic format. 
D.  Any documents created, stored or delivered under the 
electronic lien title progra m as provided in this section shall be   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB998 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendm ents)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
considered valid including any signatures which are gene rated 
electronically or contained on a scanned copy.  A written or printed 
report of a transaction or recording related to vehicles in an 
electronic format, if ce rtified as true and correct by the Oklahoma 
Tax Commission, shall serve as evidence of any sig nature 
acknowledgment, or information which was provided to or by the Tax 
Commission through electronic means, and the certification shall be 
admissible in any le gal proceeding as evidence of the facts state d 
therein. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS 
February 24, 2021 - DO PASS