Oklahoma 2023 2023 1st Special Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1028 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/23/2023

                     
 
HB1028X HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Extraordinary Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
HOUSE BILL NO. 1028 	By: Wallace and Martinez of the 
House 
 
   and 
 
  Thompson (Roger) and Hall 
of the Senate 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to the Administrative Worker s’ 
Compensation Act; amending 85A O.S. 20 21, Section 
122, which relates to costs of administering act; 
modifying distribution of certain funds; limiting 
period of certain distribution; providing for return 
of distributions on certain date; updating statutory 
reference; providing an effective date; and declaring 
an emergency. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     85A O.S. 2021, Section 122, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 122. A.  The Workers’ Compensation Commission Revolving 
Fund established by Section 28.1 of t his title shall be used for the 
costs of administering this act the Administrative Workers’ 
Compensation Act and for other purpos es as authorized by law.   
 
HB1028X HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
B.  For the purpose of providing funds for the Workers’ 
Compensation Commission Revolving Fund, for the Workers’ 
Compensation Administrative Fund c reated in Section 401.1 of this 
title, for the Multiple Injury Trust Fund created in Section 28 of 
this title, and to fund other provisions within this title, the 
following tax rates shall apply: 
1.  Each mutual or interinsurance association, stock company , 
CompSource Mutual Insurance Company or other insurance carrier 
writing workers’ compensation insurance in this state shall pay to 
the Oklahoma Tax Commission an assessment at a rate of one percent 
(1%) of all gross direct premiums written during each qua rter of the 
calendar year for workers’ compensation insurance on risks located 
in this state after deducting from such gross direct premiums, 
return premiums, unabsorbed portions of any deposit premiums, polic y 
dividends, safety refunds, savings and other similar returns paid or 
credited to policyholders.  Such payments to the Oklahoma Tax 
Commission shall be made not later than the fifteenth day of the 
month following the close of each quarter of the calendar year in 
which such gross direct premium is collected or collectible.  
Contributions made by insurance carriers and CompSource Mutual 
Insurance Company, under the provisions of this section, shall be 
considered for the purpose of computing workers ’ compensation rates; 
and   
 
HB1028X HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  When an employer is authorized to be come a self-insurer, the 
Commission shall so notify the Oklahoma Tax Commission, giving the 
effective date of such authorization.  The Oklahoma Tax Commission 
shall then assess and collect from the employers carrying their own 
risk an assessment at the rate of two percent ( 2%) of the total 
compensation for permanent total disability awards, permanent 
partial disability awards and death benefits paid out during each 
quarter of the calendar year by the employers.  Such assessment 
shall be payable by the employers and collected by the Oklahoma Tax 
Commission according to the provisions of this section regarding 
payment and collection of the assessment created in paragraph 1 of 
this subsection. 
C.  It shall be the duty of the Oklahoma Tax Commission to 
collect the payments provided for in this title.  The Oklahoma Tax 
Commission is hereby authorized to bring an action for the recovery 
of any delinquent or unpaid payments required in this section.  The 
Oklahoma Tax Commission may also enforce payments by proceeding in 
accordance with the provisions of Section 98 of this title. 
D.  The Oklahoma Tax Commission shall pay monthly to the State 
Treasurer to the credit of the Multiple Injury Trust Fund all monies 
collected under the provisions of this section , less the annual 
amounts which shall be apportioned by the Oklahoma Tax Commission, 
as follows; provided, however, if the Fund in any one month is   
 
HB1028X HFLR 	Page 4 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
insufficient to make the required payments, the unpaid portion shall 
be paid as soon as funds become available : 
1.  Five Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($5,000,000.00) 
($5,500,000.00) shall be payable each fiscal year in equal monthly 
installments to the credit of the Workers’ Compensation Commission 
Revolving Fund estab lished in Section 28.1 of this title for the 
fiscal year ending June 30, 20 16, Three Million Dollars 
($3,000,000.00) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2017, and Four 
Million Dollars ($4,000,000.00) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 
2020, and for all su bsequent years to be used to implement the 
provisions of this title; and 
2. Four Million Dollars ($4,000,000.00) shall be payable in 
equal monthly installments to the credit of the Workers’ 
Compensation Administrative Fund established in Section 401.1 of 
this title for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2016, Three Million 
Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($3,500,000.00) for the fiscal year 
ending June 30, 2017, Three Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars 
($3,500,000.00) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018, Three 
Million Dollars ($3,000,000.00) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 
2019, One Million Seven Hundred Fifty Thousand Dollars 
($1,750,000.00) shall be payable in equal monthly installments to 
the credit of the Workers' Compensation Administrative Fund 
established in Section 401.1 of this title for the fiscal year 
ending June 30, 2020, One Million Seven Hundred Fifty Thousand   
 
HB1028X HFLR 	Page 5 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Dollars ($1,750,000.00) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, 
and for all subsequent years dur ing the existence of the Court of 
Existing Claims 2023, and Two Hundred Fifty Thousand Dollars 
($250,000.00) payable in equal monthly installments to such Fund for 
the fiscal year beginning July 1, 202 3, and each subsequent fiscal 
year. 
Monies deposited in the Workers ’ Compensation Administr ative 
Fund shall be used by the Workers’ Compensation Court of Existing 
Claims to implement provisions provided for in this title. All 
unencumbered funds remaining in the Worker s' Compensation 
Administration Fund on July 1, 2027 , shall be transferred to the 
State Treasurer to be returned to the Multiple Injur y Trust Fund. 
E.  The refund provisions of Sections 227 through 229 of Title 
68 of the Oklahoma Statutes shall be app licable to any paymen ts made 
pursuant to this section. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall bec ome effective July 1, 2023. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by rea son whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON JOINT COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIA TIONS 
AND BUDGET, dated 05/ 23/2023 – DO PASS, As Amended.