ENGR. H. B. NO. 2040 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL NO. 2040 By: Nichols, Davis, Menz, Martinez, Schreiber, Hefner, Dollens, Hilbert, Bennett, and Townley of the House and Matthews of the Senate An Act relating to revenue and taxation; a mending 68 O.S. 2021, Section 2357.403, as amended by Section 1, Chapter 139, O.S .L. 2022 (68 O.S. Supp. 2022, Section 2357.403), which relate s to affordable housing tax credits; increasing amount of tax credits; making tax credit nonrefundable; and providing an effective date. BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 68 O.S. 2021, Section 2357.403, as amended by Section 1, Chapter 139, O.S.L. 2022 (68 O.S. Supp. 2022, Section 2357.403), is amen ded to read as follows: Section 2357.403 A. This act shall be known and may be cited as the "Oklahoma Affordable H ousing Act". B. As used in this section: 1. "Allocation year" means the year for which the Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency all ocates credits pursuant to this section; 2. "Eligibility statement" means a statement authorized and issued by the Oklahoma Hou sing Finance Agency certifying that a ENGR. H. B. NO. 2040 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 given project qualifies for the Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax Credit authorized by this section. The Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency, under Title 330, Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency, Chapter 36, Affordable Housing Tax Credit Program Rules, shall promulgate rules establishing criteri a upon which the eligibility statements will be issued. The eligibility statement shall specify the amount of Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax Credits allocated to a qualified project. The Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency shall only authorize the tax credits created by this section to qualified projects which are placed in service after July 1, 2015, but which shall not be used to reduce tax liability accruing prior to January 1, 2016; 3. "Federal low-income housing tax credit" means the federal tax credit as provided in Section 42 of the Internal Revenue Code o f 1986, as amended; 4. "Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax Credit" means the tax credit created by this section; 5. "Qualified project" means a qualified low-income building as that term is defined in Section 42 of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended; and 6. "Taxpayer" means a person, firm or corporation subject to the tax imposed by Section 2355 of this title or an insuran ce company subject to the tax imposed by Section 624 or 628 of Title 36 of the Oklahoma Statutes or other financial institu tion subject to the tax imposed by Section 2370 of this title. ENGR. H. B. NO. 2040 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 C. For qualified projects placed in service after July 1, 2015, the amount of state tax credits created by this section which are allocated to a project shall not exceed that of the federal low- income housing tax credits for a qualified project. The total Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax Credits allocated to all qualifi ed projects for an allocation y ear shall not exceed Four Million Dollars ($4,000,000.00) Ten Million Dollars ($10,000,000.00 ) until December 31, 2027, and Four Mil lion Dollars ($4,000,000.00) until December 31, 2033. For purposes of this section, the "credit period" shall mean the period of ten (10) taxab le years and "placed in service" shall have the same meaning as is app licable under the federal credit program. D. A taxpayer owning an interest in an investment in a qualified project shall be allowed Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax Credits under this se ction for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2016, if the Okla homa Housing Finance Agency issues an eligibility statement for such project, which tax credit shall be allocated among some or all of the partners, members or shareholders of the taxpayer owning such interest in any m anner agreed to by such partners, members or shareholders. Such taxpayer may as sign its interest in the investment, but the tax credit authorized by the provisions of this section shall not be refundable . E. An insurance company claiming a credit against state premium tax or retaliatory tax or any other tax im posed by Section 624 or ENGR. H. B. NO. 2040 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 628 of Title 36 of the Oklahoma Statutes shall not be required to pay any additional retaliato ry tax under Section 628 of Title 36 of the Oklahoma Statutes as a result of claiming the credit. The credit may fully offset any retalia tory tax imposed by Sec tion 628 of Title 36 of the Oklahoma Statutes. F. The credit authorized by this section shall not be used to reduce the tax liability of the taxpayer to less t han zero ($0.00). G. Any credit claimed but not used in a taxable year m ay be carried forward two (2) subsequent taxable years. H. The owner of a qualified project eligible for the credit authorized by this section shall submit, at the time of filing the tax return with the Oklahoma Tax Commission, an eligibility statement from the Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency. In the case of failure to attach the eligibility statement, no credit under t his section shall be allowed with respect to such project for tha t year until required documents are provided to the Tax Commission. I. If under Section 42 of t he Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, a portion of any federal low -income housing credi ts taken on a qualified project is required to be recaptured duri ng the first ten (10) years after a project is placed in service, the tax payer claiming Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax Credits with respect to such project shall also be required to recaptur e a portion of such credits. The amount of Oklahoma Affordable H ousing Tax Credits ENGR. H. B. NO. 2040 Page 5 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 subject to recapture shall be proportionally equal to the amount of federal low-income housing credits subject to recapture. J. The Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency or the Oklahoma Tax Commission may require the filing of additional docu mentation necessary to determine the accuracy of a tax credit claimed. K. The Oklahoma Affordab le Housing Act shall undergo a review every five (5) years by a committee of nine (9) persons, to be appointed three persons each by the Governor, President Pr o Tempore of the Senate, and the Speaker of the House of Representatives. SECTION 2. This act shall become effective January 1, 2024. Passed the House of Representatives the 23rd day of March, 2023. Presiding Officer of the House of Representatives Passed the Senate the ____ day of __________, 2023. Presiding Officer of the Senate