Oklahoma 2023 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2425 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/23/2023

                     
 
HB2425 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023 ) 
 
HOUSE BILL 2425 	By: May 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to professions and occupations; 
amending 59 O.S. 2021, Section 1000.24, which relates 
to the Oklahoma Uniform Building Code Commission; 
requiring amendments to code be sent to Commission 
for consideration; and providing an effective date . 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     59 O.S. 2021, Section 1000. 24, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 1000.24 A.  1.  Beginning July 1, 2009, pursuant to and 
in compliance with Article I of the Administrative Procedures Act, 
the Oklahoma Uniform Building Code Commis sion shall have the power 
to adopt, amend, repea l and promulgate rules as may be necessary to 
perform the duties required under the Oklahoma Uniform Building Code   
 
HB2425 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Commission Act.  Rules authorized under this section shall not 
become effective prior to Octo ber 1, 2009. 
2.  Beginning October 1, 2009, the Commission shall have the 
power to enforce the provisions of the Oklahoma Uniform Building 
Code Commission Act. 
3.  Any codes adopted by state agencies, municipalities or other 
political subdivisions of the s tate prior to uniform codes being 
adopted by the Oklahoma Uniform Building Code Commission , pursuant 
to the provisions of, or rules promulgated pursuant to, the Oklahoma 
Uniform Building Code Commission Act, shall be considered valid and 
in effect until uniform codes are adopted by the Oklahoma Uniform 
Building Code Commission. 
B.  The Oklahoma Uniform Building Code Commission shall have the 
following powers: 
1.  Exercise all incidental powers and duties which are 
necessary to effectuate the provisions of the Oklahoma Uniform 
Building Code Commission Act; 
2.  Adopt and have an official seal; 
3.  Maintain an administrative staff , including, but not limited 
to, an Oklahoma Uniform Building Code Commission Chief Executive 
Officer; 
4.  Direct such other expendit ures as may be necessary in the 
performance of its duties, including, but not limited to, 
expenditures for office space, equipment, furnishings and contracts   
 
HB2425 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
for services.  All expenditures shall be made pursuant to the 
Oklahoma Central Purchasing Act ; 
5.  Appoint technical committees to review and recommend for 
adoption all building codes. The technical committees shall review 
and recommend building codes with any amendments f or adoption by the 
Commission; and 
6.  Create a website listing all building codes adopted by the 
Commission.  The website shall provide a method for listing all 
codes adopted by a state agency, city or any other political 
subdivision of the st ate containing higher standards and 
requirements than the codes adopted pursuant to the Oklahoma Uniform 
Building Code Commission Act as required in Section 14-107 of Title 
11 of the Oklahoma Statutes. 
C.  After October 1, 2009, the Commission shall account for all 
receipts and expenditures of the monies of the Commission, including 
annually preparing and publishing a statement of receipts and 
expenditures of the Commission for each fiscal year.  The 
Commission's annual statement of receipts and expenditures shall be 
audited by the State Auditor and Inspector or an independent 
accounting firm, and the audit report shall be certified to the 
Governor of this state to be true and correct, under oath, by the 
chair and vice-chair of the Commission.   
 
HB2425 HFLR 	Page 4 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
D.  Any amendments or modifications to the currently adopted 
state codes shall be forwarded to the Ok lahoma Uniform Building Code 
Commission for considera tion. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2023. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON BUSINESS AND COMMERCE, dated 
02/22/2023 - DO PASS.