Oklahoma 2023 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB137 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/04/2023

                     
 
 
Req. No. 428 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE BILL 137 	By: Dahm 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to schools; directing the State 
Department of Education to implement a f our-year 
pilot program beginning in certain school year to 
provide courses and assessments on certain subjects 
to certain students; directing the Department to 
contract with certain provider; requiring certain 
courses to be made available; requiring 
administration of certain assessment; req uiring 
submission of assessment scores; requiring the 
Department to post certain scores on its website in 
certain manner; allowing the State Board of Education 
to develop certain r ules; requiring pilot program end 
by certain date; requiring sub mission of report by 
certain date; providing for contents of report; 
providing for promulga tion of rules; providing for 
codification; providing an effective date; and 
declaring an emergency . 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.    NEW LAW    A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 11-103.6p of Title 70, unless 
there is created a duplication in numb ering, reads as follows: 
A.  Beginning in the 2023-2024 school year, the State Department 
of Education shall implement a four-year pilot program to provide 
courses and assessments in U nited States history, government , and   
 
 
Req. No. 428 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
civics to eleventh-grade students enrolled in public school 
districts and public c harter schools in this s tate. 
B.  The State Department of Education shall contract with a 
provider that will make online courses and assessments available to 
eleventh-grade students at no cost to the State Department of 
Education or participating public sc hool districts or public charter 
schools. The contracted provider shall make the following courses 
available: 
1.  Introduction to the United States Constitution; 
2.  The Meaning and History of t he United States Constitution; 
3.  The Progressive Rejection of the Founding Fathers and the 
Rise of Bureaucratic Despotism; 
4.  Civil Rights in American History; and 
5.  The Federalist Papers. 
C.  After completing the courses required by subsection B of 
this section, eleven th-grade students shall be administered an 
assessment on the conte nt of the courses. School districts and 
public charter schools shall submit assessment scores to the State 
Department of Education, which shall post the scores on its website 
in a manner that complies with the Student Dat a Accessibility, 
Transparency and Accountability Act of 2013 and the Family 
Educational Rights and Privacy Act of 1974 (FERPA). 
D.  The State Board of Education may develop rules to determine 
if the pilot program courses taught pursuant to this section are   
 
 
Req. No. 428 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
eligible for academic credit toward meeting the graduation 
requirements set forth in Section 11 -103.6 of Title 70 of the 
Oklahoma Statutes. 
E.  The pilot program created in this section shall end no later 
than July 1, 2027. 
F.  By November 30, 2027, the State Department of Education 
shall submit a report to the President Pro Tempore of the Senate and 
the Speaker of the House of Representatives cont aining an evaluation 
of the results of the pilot program.  The report shall include data 
on the number of students who s core above and below seventy percent 
(70%) on the assessment required by subsection C of this section. 
G.  The State Board of Education may promulgate rules t o 
implement the provisions of this se ction. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effe ctive July 1, 2023. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof thi s act shall take effect a nd 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
59-1-428 EB 1/4/2023 3:14:47 PM