Oklahoma 2023 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB60 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/20/2022

                     
 
 
Req. No. 1054 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE BILL 60 	By: Daniels 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to professions and occupations; 
amending 59 O.S. 2021, Sectio n 161.4, which relates 
to the Board of Chiropractic Examiners; extending 
sunset date; providing an effective date; and 
declaring an emergenc y. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     59 O.S . 2021, Section 161.4, is 
amended to read as follows : 
Section 161.4. A.  A Board of Chiropractic Examiners is hereby 
re-created to continue until July 1, 2023 2026, in accordance with 
the provisions of the Oklahoma Sunset Law.  The Board shall regulate 
the practice of chiropractic in this state in accordan ce with the 
provisions of the Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act.  The Board, 
appointed by the Governor, shall be composed of eight chiropractic 
physicians and one lay member representing the public. 
B.  Each chiropractic physician m ember of the Board shal l: 
1.  Be a legal resident of this state;   
 
 
Req. No. 1054 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  Have practiced chiropractic continuously in this state 
during the five (5) y ears immediately preceding appointment to the 
Board; 
3.  Be free of pending discip linary action or active 
investigation by the Board; 
4.  Be a person of recognized professional ability, integrity 
and good reputation; and 
5.  Be in active clinical chiroprac tic practice at least fifty 
percent (50%) of the time. 
C.  The lay member of the B oard shall: 
1.  Be a legal resident of this state; a nd 
2.  Not be a registered or licensed practitioner of any of the 
healing arts or be related within the third degree of co nsanguinity 
or affinity to any such person. 
D.  The Governor shall appoint members to the Board and for 
terms of years as follows: 
1.  Position 1:  Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires November 2, 2006, the Governor shall appo int a 
board member from District 1 for a term of four (4) years to expire 
on November 1, 2010, and every four ( 4) years thereafter; 
2. Position 2:  Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires November 1, 2005, the Governor shall app oint a 
board member from District 2 for a term of four (4) years to expire 
on November 1, 2009, and every four (4) years thereafter;   
 
 
Req. No. 1054 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
3.  Position 3:  Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 2007, the Governor shall appoin t a board 
member from District 3 for a term of four (4) years to expire on 
June 1, 2011, and every four (4) yea rs thereafter; 
4.  Position 4:  Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires November 1, 2007, the Governor shall appoint a 
board member from District 4 for a term of four (4) years to expire 
on November 1, 2011, and every four (4) ye ars thereafter; 
5.  Position 5:  Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 2008, the Governor shall appoint a bo ard 
member from District 5 for a term of four (4) years to expire on 
June 1, 2012, and every four (4) years the reafter; 
6.  Position 6:  On June 1, 2005, the Governor shall appoint a 
board member from District 6 for a term of one (1) year to expire on 
June 1, 2006, and every four (4) years thereafter; 
7.  Position 7:  On November 1, 200 5, the Governor shall appoint 
a board member from Di strict 7 for a term of three (3) years to 
expire on November 1, 2008, and every four (4) years thereafter; 
8.  Position 8: Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 2005, the Governor shall appoint a board 
member from the state at large for a term of four (4) years to 
expire on June 1, 2009, and every four (4) years thereafter; and 
9.  Position 9:  The lay member of the Board shall serve a term 
coterminous with that of the Governor.   
 
 
Req. No. 1054 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
E.  For the purpose of the Oklahoma Chiro practic Practice Act, 
the state shall be divided into the following districts: 
1.  District 1:  Alfalfa, Beaver, Beckham, Caddo, Cimarron, 
Custer, Dewey, Ellis, Grant, Greer, Garfield, Harmon, Harper, 
Jackson, Kiowa, Major, Noble, Ro ger Mills, Texas, Washi ta, Woods and 
Woodward Counties; 
2.  District 2:  Tulsa County; 
3.  District 3:  Kay, Logan, Lincoln, Osage, Pawnee, Payne and 
Pottawatomie Counties; 
4.  District 4:  Carter, Comanche, Cotton, Garvin, Gra dy, Love, 
Murray, Jefferson, Stephens and Tillman Co unties; 
5.  District 5:  Blaine, Canadian, Cleveland, Kingfisher, 
McClain and Oklahoma Counties; 
6.  District 6:  Atoka, B ryan, Coal, Choctaw, Creek, Hughes, 
Johnston, Latimer, LeFlore Le Flore, Marshall, McCurtain, Okfuskee, 
Pittsburg, Pontotoc, Pushmataha and Seminole Counties; and 
7.  District 7:  Adair, Cherokee, Craig, Delaware, Haskell, 
Mayes, McIntosh, Muskogee, Nowata, Okmulge e, Ottawa, Rogers, 
Sequoyah, Wagoner and Washington Counties. 
Members appointed after June 2002 shall serve no more than two (2) 
consecutive terms. 
F.  Each member shall hold office until the expiration of the 
term of office for which appointed or until a qualified successor 
has been duly appointed.  An appointment shall be mad e by the   
 
 
Req. No. 1054 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Governor within ninety (90) d ays after the expiration of the term of 
any member, or the occurrence of a vacancy on the Board due to 
resignation, death, or any other cause res ulting in an unexpired 
term. 
G.  Before assuming duties on the Board, eac h member shall take 
and subscribe to the oath or affirmation provided in Article XV of 
the Oklahoma Constitution, which oath or affirmation shall be 
administered and filed as provided in the article. 
H.  A member may be removed from the Board by the Govern or for 
cause which shall include, but not be limited to: 
1.  Ceasing to be qualified; 
2.  Being found guilty by a court of competent jurisdiction of a 
felony or any offense involving moral turpitude; 
3.  Being found guilty, through due process, of malfeasa nce, 
misfeasance or nonfeasance in rel ation to Board duties; 
4.  Being found mentally incompetent by a court of competent 
jurisdiction; 
5.  Being found in violation of any provision o f the Oklahoma 
Chiropractic Practice Act; or 
6.  Failing to attend three meetings of the Board without just 
cause, as determined by the Board. 
I.  No member of the Board shall be: 
1.  A registered lobbyist;   
 
 
Req. No. 1054 	Page 6  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  An officer, board member or employee of a sta tewide 
organization established for the purpose of advocating the interes ts 
of chiropractors licensed pursuant to the Oklahoma Chiropractic 
Practice Act; or 
3.  An insurance claims adjuster, reviewer, or consultant; 
provided, however, a person shall not be considered to be a 
consultant solely for testifying in a court as an exp ert witness. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2023. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its p assage and approval. 
 
59-1-1054 MR 12/20/2022 1:49:32 PM