Oklahoma 2023 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB751 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/18/2023

                     
 
 
Req. No. 549 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE BILL 751 	By: Woods 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to use tax; amending 68 O.S. 2021, 
Section 1403, which re lates to apportionment of 
revenues; increasing certain apportionm ents for 
certain fiscal years; decreasing certain 
apportionments for certa in fiscal years; updating 
statutory language; providing an effective date; and 
declaring an emergency. 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF O KLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2021, Section 1403, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 1403. A.  It is hereby declared to be the purpose of 
Section 1401 et seq. of this title to pr ovide for the support of the 
functions of the state and local government of Oklahoma this state; 
and for this purpose an d to this end, it is hereby expressly 
provided that the revenues derived hereunder, subject to the 
apportionment provided in subsection B of this section and to the 
apportionment requir ements for the Oklahoma Tax Commission and 
Office of Management and Ent erprise Services Joint Computer 
Enhancement Fund provided by Section 265 of this title, are hereby 
apportioned as follows:   
 
 
Req. No. 549 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
1.  The following amounts shall be paid by the Tax Commission to 
the State Treasurer and placed to the credit of the General Revenue 
Fund to be paid out pursuant to direct appropriation by the 
Legislature: 
Fiscal Year 	Amount 
FY 2004 	85.35% 
FY 2005 	85.14% 
FY 2006 	85.54% 
FY 2007 	85.04% 
FY 2008 through FY 2022 	83.61% 
FY 2023 through FY 2027 	83.36% 
FY 2028 2024 and each fiscal year thereafter 83.61% 100%; 
2.  The following amounts shall be paid to the State Treasurer 
to be placed to the credit of the Education Reform Revolving Fu nd of 
the State Department of Educatio n: 
a. for FY 2020, ten and forty-six one-hundredths percent 
(10.46%), 
b. for FY 2021: 
(1) for the month beginning July 1, 2020, through the 
month ending August 31, 2020, ten and forty -six 
one-hundredths percent (10.46% ), and 
(2) for the month beginning Sep tember 1, 2020, 
through the month ending June 30, 2021, eleven   
 
 
Req. No. 549 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
and ninety-six one-hundredths percent (11.96%), 
and 
c. for FY 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter, ten and 
forty-six one-hundredths percent (10.46%); 
3.  The following amounts shall be paid to the State Treasurer 
to be placed to the credit of the Teachers ’ Retirement System 
Dedicated Revenue Revolving Fund: 
Fiscal Year 	Amount 
FY 2003 and FY 2004 	3.54% 
FY 2005 	3.75% 
FY 2006 	4.0% 
FY 2007 	4.5% 
FY 2008 through FY 2020 	5.0% 
FY 2021: 
a. for the month beginning July 
1, 2020, through the month 
ending August 31, 2020 	5.0% 
b. for the month beginning 
September 1, 2020, through 
the month ending June 30, 
2021 	3.5% 
FY 2022 	5.0% 
FY 2023 through FY 2027 	5.25% 
FY 2028 and each fiscal year thereafter 	5.0%;   
 
 
Req. No. 549 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
4.  a. except Except as otherwise provided in subparagraph b 
of this paragraph, for the fiscal y ear beginning July 
1, 2015, and for each fiscal year thereafter through 
fiscal year 2023, eighty-seven one-hundredths percent 
(0.87%) shall be paid to the State Treasurer to be 
further apportioned as follows: 
(1) thirty-six percent (36%) shall be placed to t he 
credit of the Oklaho ma Tourism Promotion 
Revolving Fund, but in no event shall such 
apportionment exceed the total amount appo rtioned 
pursuant to this division for t he fiscal year 
ending on June 30, 2015, and 
(2) sixty-four percent (64%) shall be place d to the 
credit of the Oklahoma Tourism Capital 
Improvement Revolving Fund, but in no event shall 
such apportionment exceed the to tal amount 
apportioned pursuant to this division for the 
fiscal year ending on June 30, 2015, and 
b. any amounts which exceed the limitations of 
subparagraph a of this paragraph shall be placed to 
the credit of the General Revenue Fund; and 
5.  For the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2015 , and for each 
fiscal year thereafter through fiscal year 2023 , six one-hundredths 
percent (0.06%) shall be placed to the credit of the Oklahoma   
 
 
Req. No. 549 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Historical Society Capital Improvement and Operations Revolving 
Fund, but in no event shall such apportionment exceed t he total 
amount apportioned pursuant to this paragraph for the fiscal year 
ending on June 30, 2015 .  Any amounts which exceed the limita tions 
of this paragraph shall be placed to the credit of the General 
Revenue Fund. 
B. Prior to the apportionments other wise provided in this 
section, there shall be apportioned to the Education Reform 
Revolving Fund of the State Department of Education th e following 
amounts in the following state fiscal years: 
FY 2019 	$19,600,000.00; and 
FY 2020 and each year thereafter $20,500,000.00. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2023. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reas on whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
59-1-549 QD 1/18/2023 5:16:37 PM