Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1776 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/09/2023

                     
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 1776 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 1776 	By: Hilbert of the House 
 
   and 
 
  Pugh of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
 
[ Semiquincentennial of the United States - Oklahoma 
Semiquincentennial Commission – report - 
Semiquincentennial Revolving Fund – codification -  
  	emergency ] 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 500 of Title 53, unless there is 
created a duplication in numberi ng, reads as follows: 
A.  There is hereby created the Oklahoma Semiquincentennial 
Commission until June 30, 2027. 
B.  The duties of the Commission shall be as follows: 
1.  Be the point of contact for state and national organizations 
and events related to the Semiquincentennial of the United States;   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 1776 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  Develop programs and plans for the official observance of 
the 250th anniversary of the founding of the United States in 2026, 
as marked by the Declaration of Independence in 1776; and 
3.  Cooperate with the United States Semiquincentennial 
Commission and various state agencies, boards, commissions, 
departments, and political s ubdivisions in order to execute 
commemorative events and to implement educational activities, 
events, and celebrations related to the Semiquincentennial of the 
United States.  
C.  The Commission shall be composed of twenty -five (25) 
members.  The members shall serve as follows: 
1.  Five members appointed by the Governor as follows: 
a. one who shall be a member with experience in the st udy 
and documentation of the history of Latino communities 
in Oklahoma, 
b. one who shall be a member with experience i n the study 
and documentation of the history of the Black 
community in Oklahoma , 
c. one who shall be a member with experience in the study 
and documentation of the history of American Indian 
communities in Oklahoma , 
d. one who shall be a current fift h-grade teacher 
currently certified to teach in Oklahoma with 
experience teaching United States history ,   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 1776 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
e. one who shall be a secondary teacher currently 
certified to teach United States history in Oklahoma; 
2.  Five members shall be appointed by the S peaker of the 
Oklahoma House of Representatives, one appointee from each of the 
five congressional districts; 
3.  Five members shall be appointed b y the President Pro Tempore 
of the Oklahoma State Senate, one appointee fro m each of the five 
congressional distric ts;  
4.  Ten voting ex officio members shall be appointed as follows: 
a. the Lieutenant Governor, who shall serve as 
chairperson, or a design ee, 
b. the Executive Director of the Oklahoma Historical 
Society, who shall serve as vice -chair, or designee, 
c. the Director of the Oklahoma Department of Commerce, 
or designee, 
d. the State Superintendent of Public Instruction, or 
designee, 
e. the Chancellor of the Oklahoma State Regents for 
Higher Education, or designee , 
f. the Executive Director of the Ok lahoma Arts Council, 
or designee, 
g. the Executive Director of the Oklahoma Tourism and 
Recreation Department, or designee ,   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 1776 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
h. the Chief Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, or 
designee, 
i. the Regent of the Oklahoma Society of the Daughters of 
the American Revolution, and 
j. the President of the Oklahoma Society of the Sons of 
the American Revolution. 
D.  Commission members may be removed for cause.  Whenever a 
vacancy on the Commission occurs by death, resignation, or 
otherwise, the appointi ng authority shall fill the same by 
appointment, and the appointee shall hold office during the 
unexpired term.  Each member shall hold office until a successor ha s 
been appointed.  
E.  All appointments to the Commission shall be made no later 
than August 1, 2023.  The Commission shall hold its first meeting no 
later than September 1, 2023. The Commission shall be staffed by 
the Oklahoma Historical Society.  All appropriate agencies of state 
government shall provide assistance to the Commission upon request 
of the Commission.  
F.  A quorum of thirteen members shall be required to conduct 
official business of the Commission. The Commission may establish 
subcommittees to effectuate the purpose of the Commission.  The 
Commission shall meet as often as necessary to per form its duties.  
G.  Members of the Commission shall receive no compensation for 
serving on the Commission but shall receive travel reimbursement for   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 1776 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
necessary travel expenses incurred in the performance of their 
duties by their respective agencies in acc ordance with the State 
Travel Reimbursement Act. 
H.  The Commission shall be authorized to: 
1. Employ personnel; 
2. Contract for services ; and 
3. Accept gifts, grants, and donations which shall be deposited 
into the Semiquincentennial Revolving Fund, created in Section 2 of 
this act.  
I.  On or after June 30, 2027, any remaining supplies or 
property of the Commission shall transfer to the Oklahoma Histo rical 
Society.  
J.  No later than March 1, 2024, the Commission shall 
electronically submit a report to the Governor, President Pro 
Tempore of the Senate, and the Speaker of the House of 
Representatives to include the following information: 
1.  Mission statement of the Commission;  
2.  Goals of the Commission; 
3.  List of proposed activities; 
4.  List of milestones along with applicable dates for executing 
the proposed activities; and 
5.  Projected budget for planned activities and private 
fundraising goals.    
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 1776 	Page 6  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 2.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 501 of Title 53, unless there is 
created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
There is hereby created in the State Treasury a revolving fund 
for the Oklahoma Historical Society to be designated the 
"Semiquincentennial Revolving Fund ".  The fund shall be a continuing 
fund, not subject to fiscal year limitations, and shall consist of 
all monies received from legislative appropriat ions, private 
donations, gifts, and grants.  All monies accruing to the credit of 
the fund are hereby appropriated an d may be budgeted and expended by 
the Oklahoma Semiquincentennial Commission for the purposes of the 
Commission.  Expenditures from the fun d shall be made upon warrants 
issued by the State Treasurer against claims filed as prescribed by 
law with the Directo r of the Office of Management and Enterprise 
Services for approval and payment. The Semiquincentennial Revolving 
Fund shall sunset on Jun e 30, 2027.  Any remaining monies in the 
fund shall transfer to the Historical Society Revolving Fund, 
created in Section 1.10 of Title 53 of the Oklahoma Statutes. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage an d approval. 
   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 1776 	Page 7  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Passed the House of Representatives the 8th day of March, 2023. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2023. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate