Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2238 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/01/2023

                     
Req. No. 7867 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
HOUSE BILL NO. 2238 	By: Ford 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to public health; amending 63 O.S. 
2021, Section 1-229.35, which relates to vapor 
product reporting; modifying compliance deadlines; 
and declaring an emergency . 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLA HOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     63 O.S. 2021, Section 1-229.35, as 
amended by Section 1, Chapter 95, O.S.L. 2022 (63 O.S. Supp. 2022, 
Section 1-229.35), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 1-229.35 A.  Beginning July 1, 2023 2024, every 
manufacturer of a vapor product that is sold or inte nded to be sold 
in this state, whether directly or through a di stributor, retailer, 
or similar intermediary or intermediaries, shall execute and deliver 
an attestation under penalty o f perjury to the Oklahoma Alcoholic 
Beverage Laws Enforcement (ABLE) Comm ission certifying that, as of 
the date of such attestation: 
1.  The vapor product was available for purchase in the United 
States as of August 8, 2016, and the manufacturer has applie d for a 
marketing order for the vap or product by submitting a Premarket   
Req. No. 7867 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Tobacco Product Application on or before September 9, 2020, to t he 
United States Food and Drug Administration (FDA); or 
2.  The manufacturer has received a marketing order or other 
authorization for the vapor product fr om the FDA pursuant to Section 
387j of Title 21 of the United States Code. 
B.  The manufacturer shall notify the ABLE Commission within 
thirty (30) days of any material change to the attestation, 
including whether the FDA has issued or not issued a market order or 
other authorization or has or dered the manufacturer to remove the 
vapor product, either temp orarily or permanently, from the United 
States market. 
C.  The ABLE Commission shall develop a directory listing all of 
the manufacturers that have provide d attestations that comply with 
subsection A of this section and all vapor products that are listed 
in such attestations.  The ABLE Commission shall: 
1.  Make the directory available for public inspection on its 
website on or before October 1, 2023 2024; and 
2.  Update the directory as necessa ry to correct mistakes and to 
add or remove manufacturers or va por products to maintain the 
directory in conformity with the requirements of this section. 
D.  It shall be unlawful for any person, directly or indirectly , 
to knowingly manufacture, distribute , sell, barter, or furnish in 
this state any vapor product that is not included in the directory.   
Req. No. 7867 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 2.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
59-1-7867 LRB 03/01/2023