Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2806 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/19/2023

                     
 
Req. No. 5989 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
HOUSE BILL 2806 	By: Kendrix 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to sunset; amending 59 O.S. 2021, 
Section 161.4, which relates to the Board of 
Chiropractic Examiners ; re-creating the Board; and 
modifying termination date . 
 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     59 O.S. 2021, Section 161.4, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 161.4 A.  A Board of Chiropracti c Examiners is hereby 
re-created to continue until July 1, 2023 2029, in accordance with 
the provisions of the Oklahoma Sunset Law.  The Board shall regulate 
the practice of chiropractic in this state in accordance with the 
provisions of the Oklahoma Chiro practic Practice Act.  The Board, 
appointed by the Governor, shall be composed of eight chiropractic 
physicians and one lay member representing the public. 
B.  Each chiropractic physician m ember of the Board shall: 
1.  Be a legal resident of this state;   
 
Req. No. 5989 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2. Have practiced chiropractic continuously i n this state 
during the five (5) years immediately preceding appointment to the 
Board; 
3.  Be free of pending disciplinary action or active 
investigation by the Board; 
4.  Be a person of recognized professional a bility, integrity 
and good reputation; and 
5. Be in active clinical chiropractic practice at least fifty 
percent (50%) of the time. 
C.  The lay member of the Board shall: 
1.  Be a legal resident of this state; and 
2.  Not be a registered or licensed pract itioner of any of the 
healing arts or be rel ated within the third degree of consanguinity 
or affinity to any such person. 
D.  The Governor shall appoint members to the Board and for 
terms of years as follows: 
1.  Position 1:  Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires Novembe r 2, 2006, the Governor shall appoint a 
board member from District 1 for a term of four (4) years to expire 
on November 1, 2010, and every four ( 4) years thereafter; 
2.  Position 2:  Upon expiration of the term o f the board member 
whose term expires Novemb er 1, 2005, the Governor shall appoint a 
board member from District 2 for a term of four (4) years to expire 
on November 1, 2009, and every four (4) years thereafter;   
 
Req. No. 5989 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
3.  Position 3:  Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 2007, the Governor shall appoint a board 
member from District 3 for a term of four (4) years to expire on 
June 1, 2011, and every four (4) yea rs thereafter; 
4.  Position 4:  Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires November 1, 2007, the Governor shall appoint a 
board member from District 4 for a term of four (4) years to expire 
on November 1, 2011, and every four (4) ye ars thereafter; 
5.  Position 5:  Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 200 8, the Governor shall appoint a board 
member from District 5 for a term of four (4) years to expire on 
June 1, 2012, and every four (4) years the reafter; 
6.  Position 6:  On June 1, 2005, the Governor shall appoi nt a 
board member from District 6 for a term of one (1) year to expire on 
June 1, 2006, and every four (4) years thereafter; 
7.  Position 7:  On November 1, 2005, the Governor shall appoint 
a board member from District 7 for a term of three (3) years to 
expire on November 1, 2008, and every four (4) years thereafter; 
8.  Position 8:  Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 2005, the Governor shall appoint a board 
member from the state at large for a term of four (4) years to 
expire on June 1, 2009, and every four (4 ) years thereafter; and 
9.  Position 9:  The lay member of the Board shall serve a term 
coterminous with that of the Governor.   
 
Req. No. 5989 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
E.  For the purpose of the Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act, 
the state shall be div ided into the following districts: 
1.  District 1:  Alfalfa, Beaver, Beckham, Caddo, Cimarron, 
Custer, Dewey, Ellis, Grant, Greer, Garfield, Harmon, Harper, 
Jackson, Kiowa, Major, Noble, Ro ger Mills, Texas, Washita, Woods and 
Woodward Counties; 
2.  District 2:  Tulsa County; 
3.  District 3:  Kay, Lo gan, Lincoln, Osage, Pawnee, Payne and 
Pottawatomie Counties; 
4.  District 4:  Carter, Comanche, Cotton, Garvin, Grady, Love, 
Murray, Jefferson, Stephens and Tillman Counties; 
5.  District 5:  Blaine, Canadian, C leveland, Kingfisher, 
McClain and Oklahoma C ounties; 
6.  District 6:  Atoka, Bryan, Coal, Choctaw, Creek, Hughes, 
Johnston, Latimer, LeFlore, Marshall, McCurtain, Okfuskee, 
Pittsburg, Pontotoc, Pushmataha and Seminole Counties; and 
7.  District 7:  Adair, Cherokee, Craig, Delaware, Haskell, 
Mayes, McIntosh, Muskogee, Nowata, Okmulgee, Ottawa, Rogers, 
Sequoyah, Wagoner and Washington Counties. 
Members appointed after June 2002 shall serve no more than two (2) 
consecutive terms. 
F.  Each member shall hold off ice until the expiration of the 
term of office for which appointed or until a qualified successor 
has been duly appointed.  An appointment shall be made by the   
 
Req. No. 5989 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Governor within ninety (90) d ays after the expiration of the term of 
any member, or the occurren ce of a vacancy on the Board due to 
resignation, death, or any other cause resulting in an unexpired 
term. 
G.  Before assuming duties on the Board, each member shall take 
and subscribe to the oath or affirmation provided in Article XV of 
the Oklahoma Constitution, which oath or affirmation shall be 
administered and filed as provided in the article. 
H.  A member may be removed from the Board by the Governor for 
cause which shall include, but not be limited to: 
1.  Ceasing to be qualified; 
2.  Being found guilty by a court of competent jurisdiction of a 
felony or any offense involving moral turpitude; 
3.  Being found guilty, through due process, of malfeasance, 
misfeasance or nonfeasance in rel ation to Board duties; 
4.  Being found mentally incompetent by a co urt of competent 
jurisdiction; 
5.  Being found in violation of any provision of the Oklahoma 
Chiropractic Practice Act; or 
6.  Failing to attend three meetings of the Board without just 
cause, as determined by the Board. 
I.  No member of the Board shall be : 
1.  A registered lobbyist;   
 
Req. No. 5989 	Page 6  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  An officer, board member or employee of a statewide 
organization established for the purpose of advocating the interests 
of chiropractors licensed pursuant to the Oklahoma Chiropractic 
Practice Act; or 
3.  An insurance clai ms adjuster, reviewer, or consultant; 
provided, however, a person shall not be considered to be a 
consultant solely for testi fying in court as an expert witness. 
 
59-1-5989 LRB 01/07/23