ENGR. H. B. NO. 2806 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL NO. 2806 By: Kendrix of the House and Daniels of the Senate An Act relating to sunset; amending 59 O.S. 2021, Section 161.4, which relates to the Board of Chiropractic Examiners; and removing Board from Oklahoma Sunset Law. BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 59 O.S. 2021, Section 161.4, is amended to read as follows: Section 161.4 A. A Board of Chiropractic Examiners is hereby re-created to continue until July 1, 2023, in accordance with the provisions of the Oklahoma Sunset Law . The Board shall regulate the practice of chiropractic in this state in accordance with the provisions of the Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act. The Board, appointed by the Governor, shall be composed of eight chiropractic physicians and one lay member representing the public. B. Each chiropractic physician m ember of the Board shall: 1. Be a legal resident of this state; ENGR. H. B. NO. 2806 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 2. Have practiced chiropractic conti nuously in this state during the five (5) years immediately preceding appointment to the Board; 3. Be free of pending disciplinary action or active investigation by the Board; 4. Be a person of recogniz ed professional ability, integrity and good reputation; and 5. Be in active clinical chiropractic practice at least fifty percent (50%) of the time. C. The lay member of the Board shall: 1. Be a legal resident of this state; and 2. Not be a registered or licensed practitioner of any of the healing arts or be related within the third degree of consanguinity or affinity to any such person. D. The Governor shall appoint members to the Board and for terms of years as follows: 1. Position 1: Upon expirati on of the term of the board member whose term expires November 2, 2006, the Governor shall appoint a board member from District 1 for a term of four (4) years to expire on November 1, 2010, and every four ( 4) years thereafter; 2. Position 2: Upon expirat ion of the term of the board member whose term expires November 1, 2005, the Governor shall appoint a board member from District 2 for a term of four (4) years to expire on November 1, 2009, and every four (4) years thereafter; ENGR. H. B. NO. 2806 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 3. Position 3: Upon expira tion of the term of the board member whose term expires June 7, 2007, the Governor shall appoint a board member from District 3 for a term of four (4) years to expire on June 1, 2011, and every four (4) yea rs thereafter; 4. Position 4: Upon expiration of the term of the board member whose term expires Nov ember 1, 2007, the Governor shall appoint a board member from District 4 for a term of four (4) years to expire on November 1, 2011, and every four (4) ye ars thereafter; 5. Position 5: Upon expiration o f the term of the board member whose term expires Ju ne 7, 2008, the Governor shall appoint a board member from District 5 for a term of four (4) years to expire on June 1, 2012, and every four (4) years the reafter; 6. Position 6: On June 1, 2005, the Gov ernor shall appoint a board member from District 6 f or a term of one (1) year to expire on June 1, 2006, and every four (4) years thereafter; 7. Position 7: On November 1, 2005, the Governor shall appoint a board member from District 7 for a term of thre e (3) years to expire on November 1, 2008, and every four (4) years thereafter; 8. Position 8: Upon expiration of the term of the board member whose term expires June 7, 2005, the Governor shall appoint a board member from the state at large for a term o f four (4) years to expire on June 1, 2009, and ever y four (4) years thereafter; and 9. Position 9: The lay member of the Board shall serve a term coterminous with that of the Governor. ENGR. H. B. NO. 2806 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 E. For the purpose of the Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act, the state shall be divided into the following districts: 1. District 1: Alfalfa, Beaver, Beckham, Caddo, Cimarron, Custer, Dewey, Ellis, Grant, Greer, Garfield, Harmon, Harper, Jackson, Kiowa, Major, Noble, Ro ger Mills, Texas, Washita, Woods and Woodward Counties; 2. District 2: Tulsa County; 3. District 3: Kay, Logan, Lincoln, Osage, Pawnee, Payne and Pottawatomie Counties; 4. District 4: Carter, Comanche, Cotton, Garvin, Grady, Love, Murray, Jefferson, Stephens and Tillman Counties; 5. District 5: Blaine, Canadian, Cleveland, Kingfisher, McClain and Oklahoma Counties; 6. District 6: Atoka, Bryan, Coal, Choctaw, Creek, Hughes, Johnston, Latimer, LeFlore, Marshall, McCurtain, Okfuskee, Pittsburg, Pontotoc, Pushmataha and Seminole Counties; and 7. District 7: Adair, Cherokee, Craig, Delaware, Haskell, Mayes, McIntosh, Muskogee, Nowata, Okmulgee, Ottawa, Rogers, Sequoyah, Wagoner and Washington Counties. Members appointed after June 2002 shall serve no more than two (2) consecutive terms. F. Each member shall hold office until the expiration of the term of office for which appointed or until a qualified successor has been duly appointed. An appointment shall be made by the ENGR. H. B. NO. 2806 Page 5 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 Governor within ninety (90) d ays after the expiration of the term of any member, or the occurrence of a vacancy on the Board due to resignation, death, or any other cause resulting in an unexpired term. G. Before assuming duties on the Board, each member shall take and subscribe to the oath or affirmation provided in Article XV of the Oklahoma Constitution, which oath or affirmation shall be administered and filed as provided in the article. H. A member may be removed from the Board by the Governor for cause which shall include, but not be limited to: 1. Ceasing to be qualified; 2. Being found guilty by a court of competent jurisdi ction of a felony or any offense involving moral turpitude; 3. Being found guilty, through due process, of malfeasance, misfeasance or nonfeasance in rel ation to Board duties; 4. Being found mentally in competent by a court of competent jurisdiction; 5. Being found in violation of any provision of the Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act; or 6. Failing to attend three meetings of the Board without just cause, as determined by the Board. I. No member of the Board shall be: 1. A registered lobbyist; ENGR. H. B. NO. 2806 Page 6 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 2. An officer, board member or employee of a statewide organization established for the purpose of advocating the interests of chiropractors licensed pursuant to the Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act; or 3. An insurance claims adjuster, reviewer, or consultan t; provided, however, a person shall not be considered to be a consultant solely for testi fying in a court as an expert witness. Passed the House of Representatives the 28th day of February, 2023. Presiding Officer of the House of Representatives Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2023. Presiding Officer of the Senate