Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2928 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/27/2024

                     
 
HB2928 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
HOUSE BILL NO. 2928 	By: Wallace and Caldwell (Trey ) 
of the House 
 
   and 
 
  Hall and Rosino of the 
Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Department of 
Commerce; requiring that portions of certain funds be 
utilized for certain purposes; pro viding budgeting 
and expenditure limitations and procedures; providing 
for lapse of funds under certain conditions; 
providing an effective date; and declaring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd 
Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of T wo Hundred 
Twenty-nine Thousand Nine Hundred Forty-five Dollars ($229,945.00) 
shall, under the direction of the Executive Direc tor of Commerce, be   
 
HB2928 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
allocated to support the Community Expansion of Nutrition Assis tance 
Program. 
SECTION 2.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd 
Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of One Hundred 
Fifty Thousand Dollars ($150,000.00 ) shall, under the direction of 
the Executive Director of Commerce, be allocated to various Councils 
of Government to support substate planning . 
SECTION 3.  From the funds appropriated t o the Oklahoma 
Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd 
Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Thirty-six 
Thousand Two Hundred Twenty-one Dollars ($36,221.00 ) shall, under 
the direction of the Executive Direc tor of Commerce, be allocated to 
support the functions of commun ity action agencies. 
SECTION 4.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd 
Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of One Hundred 
Eighty-three Thousand Eight Hundred Seventy-four Dollars 
($183,874.00) shall, under the direction of the Executive Direc tor 
of Commerce, be allocated to community action agencies to support 
Head Start programs. 
SECTION 5.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd 
Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Sixty-four   
 
HB2928 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Thousand Two Hundred Seventeen Dollars ($64,217.00 ) shall, under the 
direction of the Executive Direc tor of Commerce, be allocate d to the 
RX for Oklahoma Prescription Assistance program. 
SECTION 6.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd 
Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Eight Hundred 
Fifty Thousand Dollars ($850,0 00.00) shall, under the direction of 
the Executive Director of Commerce, be allocated to support Small 
Business Development Centers. 
SECTION 7.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd 
Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Ten Million 
Dollars ($10,000,000.00) shall, under the direction of the Executive 
Director of Commerce, be allocated to help fund at Rogers State 
University a new Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics 
(STEM) building. 
SECTION 8.  Appropriations made by this act, not including 
appropriations made for capital outlay purpos es, may be budgeted for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025 (hereafter FY-25) or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2026 (hereafter FY-26).  
Funds budgeted for FY-25 may be encumbered only through June 30, 
2025, and must be expended by No vember 15, 2025.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2025, and not budgeted for FY-26, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal   
 
HB2928 HFLR 	Page 4 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
year.  Funds budgeted for FY-26 may be encumbered only through June 
30, 2026.  Any funds remaining after November 15, 2026, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.  
These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY-25, and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year, may be budget ed for FY-26, after 
the agency to which the funds have been approp riated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds 
from the FY-25 budget work program and after such revision has been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. 
SECTION 9.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2024. 
SECTION 10.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof th is act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON JOINT COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS 
AND BUDGET, dated 05/27/2024 - DO PASS, As Amended.