An Act ENROLLED HOUSE BILL NO. 2928 By: Wallace and Caldwell (Trey ) of the House and Hall and Rosino of the Senate An Act relating to the Oklahoma Department of Commerce; requiring that portions of certain funds be utilized for certain purpo ses; providing budgeting and expenditure limitations and procedures; providing for lapse of funds under certain conditions; providing an effective date; and declaring an emergency. SUBJECT: Oklahoma Department of Commerce BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of T wo Hundred Twenty-nine Thousand Nine Hundred Forty-five Dollars ($229,945.00) shall, under the direction of the Executive Direc tor of Commerce, be allocated to support the Community Expansion of Nutrition Assis tance Program. SECTION 2. From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma Department of Commerce in Enrol led Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of One Hundred Fifty Thousand Dollars ($150,000.00 ) shall, under the direction of the Executive Director of Commerce, be allocat ed to various Councils of Government to support substate planning . SECTION 3. From the funds appropriated t o the Oklahoma Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Thirty-six ENR. H. B. NO. 2928 Page 2 Thousand Two Hundred Twenty-one Dollars ($36,221.00 ) shall, under the direction of the Executive Direc tor of Commerce, be allocated to support the functions of commun ity action agencies. SECTION 4. From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of One Hundred Eighty-three Thousand Eight Hundred Seventy-four Dollars ($183,874.00) shall, under the direction of the Executive Director of Commerce, be allocated to community action agencies to support Head Start programs. SECTION 5. From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Sixty-four Thousand Two Hundred Seventeen Dollars ($64,217.00 ) shall, under the direction of the Executive Direc tor of Commerce, be allocate d to the RX for Oklahoma Prescription Assistance program. SECTION 6. From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Eight Hundred Fifty Thousand Dollars ($850,0 00.00) shall, under the direction of the Executive Director of Commerce, be allo cated to support Small Business Development Centers. SECTION 7. From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma Department of Commerce in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Ten Million Dollars ($10,000,000.00) shall, under the direction of the Executive Director of Commerce, be allocated to help fund at Rogers State University a new Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics (STEM) building. SECTION 8. Appropriations made by this act, not including appropriations made for capital outlay purpos es, may be budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025 (hereafter FY-25) or may be budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2026 (hereafter FY-26). Funds budgeted for FY-25 may be encumbered only through June 30, 2025, and must be expended by No vember 15, 2025. Any funds remaining after November 15, 2025, and not budgeted for FY-26, shall lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year. Funds budgeted for FY-26 may be encumbered only through June 30, 2026. Any funds remaining after November 15, 2026, shall lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year. ENR. H. B. NO. 2928 Page 3 These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years simultaneously. Funds budgeted in FY-25, and not required to pay obligations for that fiscal year, may be budget ed for FY-26, after the agency to which the funds have been approp riated has prepared and submitted a budget work program revision removing the se funds from the FY-25 budget work program and after such revision has been approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. SECTION 9. This act shall become effective July 1, 2024. SECTION 10. It being immediately necessary for the preservation of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby declared to exist, by reason whereof th is act shall take effect and be in full force from and after its pas sage and approval. ENR. H. B. NO. 2928 Page 4 Passed the House of Representat ives the 28th day of May, 2024. Presiding Officer of the House of Representatives Passed the Senate the 30th day of May, 2024. Presiding Officer of the Senate OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. By: _________________________________ Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ day of ______________ _____, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. _________________________________ Governor of the State of Oklahoma OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ day of ___________________, 20_______ , at _______ o'clock _______ M. By: _________________________________