Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2929 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/27/2024

                     
 
HB2929 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
HOUSE BILL NO. 2929 	By: Wallace and Caldwell (Trey) 
of the House 
 
   and 
 
  Hall and Rosino of the 
Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Department of Mental 
Health and Substance Abuse Services; requiring that 
portions of certain appropriated funds be used for 
certain purposes; providing budgeting and expenditure 
limitations and procedures; providing for lapse of 
funds under certain conditions; providing an 
effective date; and declaring an emergency . 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.  From the funds appropriat ed to the Department of 
Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services in Enrolled Senate Bill 
No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legis lature, the 
sum of Three Million Nine Hundred Forty -eight Thousand Seven Hundred 
Sixty Dollars ($3,948,760.00) shall be used for annualization of the 
state portion of Medicaid rates.   
 
HB2929 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 2.  From the funds appropriated to the Department of 
Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services in Enrolled Senate Bill 
No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the 
sum of Eighteen Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars 
($18,500,000.00) shall be used for the continuum of care for 
children in crisis. 
SECTION 3.  From the funds appropria ted to the Department of 
Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services in Enrolled Senate Bill 
No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the 
sum of Four Million One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($4,100,000.00) 
shall be reserved for implementation of potential consent de crees 
entered during the 2024 calendar year. 
SECTION 4.  From the funds appropriated to the Department of 
Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services in Enr olled Senate Bill 
No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the 
sum of Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($500,000.00) shall b e used to 
maintain five pilot programs to provide offenders incarcerated in 
county jails in the State of O klahoma access to United States Food 
and Drug Administration -approved, evidence-based, medication-
assisted treatment for opioid and alcohol dependence .  Treatment may 
be administered while the inmate is confined in the county jail and 
when participating in outpatient care upon release. Funding may 
only be used for medical evaluations, the purchase o f United States 
Food and Drug Administration-approved medication to treat opioid or   
 
HB2929 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
alcohol dependency, individual and group counseling services, 
cognitive behavioral therapies and necessary medical and behavioral 
health staff needed to maintain the progra m. 
SECTION 5.  The Commissioner of th e Department of Mental Health 
and Substance Abuse Services may request through the Director of the 
Office of Management and Enterprise Services the early transfer by 
the Oklahoma Tax Commission of tax collections to the General 
Revenue Fund for the purpose of early allocation to the Department 's 
disbursing funds to alleviate cash -flow problems. 
SECTION 6.  Appropriations made by this act, not including 
appropriations made for capital o utlay purposes, may be budgeted for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025 (hereafter FY-25) or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2026 (hereafter FY -26).  
Funds budgeted for FY -25 may be encumbered only through June 30, 
2025, and must be ex pended by November 15, 2025.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2025, and not budgeted for FY -26, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY-26 may be encumbered only through June 
30, 2026.  Any funds remaining after November 15, 2026, shall laps e 
to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year. 
These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY -25, and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY -26, after 
the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared   
 
HB2929 HFLR 	Page 4 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds 
from the FY-25 budget work program and after such revision ha s been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterpr ise Services. 
SECTION 7.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2024. 
SECTION 8.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reas on whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON JOINT COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS 
AND BUDGET, dated 05/27/2024 - DO PASS, As Amended.