ENGR. H. B. NO. 2929 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL NO. 2929 By: Wallace and Caldwell (Trey) of the House and Hall and Rosino of the Senate An Act relating to the Oklahoma Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; requiring that portions of certain a ppropriated funds be used for certain purposes; providing budgeting and expenditure limitations and procedures; providing for lapse of funds under certain conditions; providing an effective date; and declaring an emergency . BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. From the funds appropriat ed to the Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legis lature, the sum of Three Million Nine Hundred Forty-eight Thousand Seven Hundred Sixty Dollars ($3,948,760.00) shall be used for annualization of the state portion of Medicaid rates. SECTION 2. From the funds appropriated to the Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Eighteen Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ENGR. H. B. NO. 2929 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 ($18,500,000.00) shall be used for the continuum of care for children in crisis. SECTION 3. From the funds appropria ted to the Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Four Million One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($4,100,000.00) shall be reserved for implementation of potential consent de crees entered during the 2024 calendar year. SECTION 4. From the funds appropriated to the Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services in Enr olled Senate Bill No. 1125 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($500,000.00) shall b e used to maintain five pilot programs to provide offenders incarcerated in county jails in the State of O klahoma access to United States Food and Drug Administration -approved, evidence-based, medication- assisted treatment for opioid and alcohol dependence . Treatment may be administered while the inmate is confined in the county jail and when participating in outpatient care upon release. Funding may only be used for medical evaluations, the purchase o f United States Food and Drug Administration-approved medication to treat opioid or alcohol dependency, individual and group counseling services, cognitive behavioral therapies and necessary medical and behavioral health staff needed to maintain the progra m. ENGR. H. B. NO. 2929 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 SECTION 5. The Commissioner of th e Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services may request through the Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise Services the early transfer by the Oklahoma Tax Commission of tax collections to the General Revenue Fund for the purpose of early allocation to the Department 's disbursing funds to alleviate cash -flow problems. SECTION 6. Appropriations made by this act, not including appropriations made for capital o utlay purposes, may be budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025 (hereafter FY-25) or may be budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2026 (hereafter FY -26). Funds budgeted for FY-25 may be encumbered only through June 30, 2025, and must be ex pended by November 15, 2025. Any funds remaining after November 15, 2025, and not budgeted for FY -26, shall lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fisca l year. Funds budgeted for FY-26 may be encumbered only through June 30, 2026. Any funds remaining after November 15, 2026, shall laps e to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year. These appropriations may not be budgeted in both f iscal years simultaneously. Funds budgeted in FY -25, and not required to pay obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY -26, after the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds from the FY-25 budget work program and after such revision ha s been approved by the Office of Management and Enterpr ise Services. ENGR. H. B. NO. 2929 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 SECTION 7. This act shall become effective July 1, 2024. SECTION 8. It being immediately necessary for the preservation of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby declared to exist, by reas on whereof this act shall take effect and be in full force from and after its passage and approval. Passed the House of Representatives the 28th day of May, 2024. Presiding Officer of the House of Representatives Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2024. Presiding Officer of the Senate