Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2948 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/16/2024

                     
 
HB2948 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) 
 
HOUSE BILL 2948 	By: McCall 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to revenue and taxation; providing 
for deduction from taxable income computed pursuant 
to Oklahoma Income Tax Code for corporations; 
specifying amount of deduction; specifying taxable 
years for which deduction is authorized; prescribing 
procedures for election; providing certain ex ceptions 
related to subsidiaries; providing for codification; 
and providing an effective date . 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codi fied 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 2358. CE-1 of Title 68, unless 
there is created a duplication in numbering, r eads as follows: 
For taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2024, based 
upon an election as authorized by Section 2 of this act, there shall 
be deducted from the Oklahoma taxable income amount for any 
corporation subject to the levy of inco me tax imposed pursuant to 
Section 2355 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes or from the amount 
of income subject to the levy of tax imposed purs uant to Section 
2370 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes the following amounts:   
 
HB2948 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
1.  Twenty percent (20%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income 
amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2023, and 
before January 1, 2025; 
2.  Forty percent (40%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income 
amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2024, and 
before January 1, 2026; 
3.  Sixty percent (60%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income 
amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2025, and 
before January 1, 202 7; 
4.  Eighty percent (80%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income 
amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2026, and 
before January 1, 202 8; and 
5.  One hundred percent (100%) of the total Oklahoma taxable 
income amount for any taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 
2028. 
SECTION 2.     NEW LAW     A new secti on of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 2358.CE-2 of Title 68, unless 
there is created a dup lication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  Not later than June 30, 202 4, for entities in existence as 
of the effective date of this act, and not later than sixty (60) 
days after the formation of a n entity subject to taxation pursuant 
to Section 2355 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes or subject to 
taxation pursuant to Section 2370 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma 
Statutes which occurs after the effect ive date of this act, a   
 
HB2948 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
taxpayer shall make an election, wh ich shall be irrevocable, on such 
form as may be prescribed for such purpose by the Oklahoma Tax 
Commission, and except as otherwise provided by this section, to 
reduce taxable income as required pursuant to Section 1 of this act . 
B.  The irrevocable election authorized by subsection A of this 
section shall be binding upon any subsidiary entity of the taxpayer 
making such election unles s otherwise provided by this section. 
C.  The irrevocable election othe rwise prescribed by subsection 
A of this section shall not be binding with respect to an entity 
which was a subsidiary of an entity making such election during any 
period of time the former subs idiary was not acquired by any other 
entity. 
D.  If a former subsidiary of an entity making an ele ction 
pursuant to subsection A of this section is acquired by another 
entity, the entity having acquired such former subsidi ary shall be 
authorized to make an irrevocable election which is binding upon the 
former subsidiary of the previous entity. 
SECTION 3.  This act shall become effective January 1, 2024. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON RULES, dated 02/13/2024 - DO PASS.