Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2991 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/07/2024

                     
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 2991 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 2991 	By: West (Josh) of the House 
 
   and 
 
  Gollihare of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to retirement; amending 11 O.S. 2021, 
Section 49-106, as amended by Section 1, Chapter 151, 
O.S.L. 2023 (11 O.S. Sup p. 2023, Section 49-106), 
which relates to the Oklahoma Firefighters Pension 
and Retirement System; updating reference; directing 
that revisions be taken into accoun t; and declaring 
an emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOP LE OF THE STATE OF OK LAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     11 O.S. 2021, Section 49 -106, as 
amended by Section 1, Chapter 151, O.S.L. 2023 (11 O.S. Supp. 2023, 
Section 49-106), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 49-106. A.  Any firefighter w ho reaches the 
firefighter's normal retirement date shall be entitl ed, upon written 
request, to retire from such service and be paid from the Oklahoma 
Firefighters Pension and Retirement System a monthly pension equal 
to the member's accrued retirement ben efit; provided, that the 
pension shall cease during any period of time the member may 
thereafter serve for compe nsation in any municipal fire departme nt 
in the state.  If such a member is reemployed by a participating   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 2991 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
municipality in a position which is no t covered by the System, 
retirement shall also include receipt by such member of in-service 
distributions from t he System. 
B.  With respect to distrib utions under the System made for 
calendar years beginning on or after January 1, 2005, the System 
shall apply the minimum distribution incidental benefit 
requirements, incidental benefit requirements, and minimum 
distribution requirements of Section 401(a) (9) of the Internal 
Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, in accordance with the final 
regulations under Sect ion 401(a)(9) of the Internal Revenue Code of 
1986, as amended, including Treasury Regulations Sections 
1.401(a)(9)-1 through 1.401(a)(9) -9; provided, however, that for 
distributions required to be made after December 31, 2019, for 
individuals who attain s eventy and one-half (70 1/2) years of age 
after December 31, 2019, but before January 1, 2023, such 
distributions shall take into account that age 70 1 /2 was stricken 
and age 72 was inserted in Section 401(a)(9)(B)(i v)(I), Section 
401(a)(9)(C)(i)(I) and Se ction 401(a)(9)(C)(ii)(I) of the Internal 
Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, and, provided further, that for 
individuals who attain seventy-two (72) years of age after December 
31, 2022, such distributions shall take into account that "age 72" 
was stricken and "the applicable age", as defined in Section 
401(a)(9)(C)(v) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, 
was inserted in Section 401(a)(9)(B)( iv)(I) of the Internal Revenue   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 2991 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Code of 1986, as amended (applicab le to calendar year 2023) , Section 
401(a)(9)(C)(i)(I) and Section 401(a)(9)(C)(ii)(I) of the Internal 
Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, and that the further revision of 
Section 401(a)(9)(B)(iv) of the Internal Revenue Cod e of 1986, as 
amended, effective for calendar years after 2023 with r espect to 
certain distributions shall be taken into account, in all cases 
notwithstanding any provision of the System to the contrary.  With 
respect to distributions under the System made for calendar years 
beginning on or after January 1, 2001, through De cember 31, 2004, 
the System shall apply the minimum distribution requirements and 
incidental benefit requirements of Section 401(a)(9) of the Internal 
Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, in accordance with the regulations 
under Section 401(a)(9) of the Inter nal Revenue Code of 1986, as 
amended, which were proposed in January 2001, notwithstanding any 
provision of the System to the contrary.  Effective July 1, 1989, 
notwithstanding any other provision contained herein to the 
contrary, in no event shall commenc ement of distributio n of the 
accrued retirement benefit of a member be delayed beyond April 1 of 
the calendar year following the later of: 
1.  The calendar year in w hich the member reache s seventy and 
one-half (70 1/2) years of age for a member who attains age seventy 
and one-half (70 1/2) before January 1, 2020, or effective for 
distributions required to be made after December 31, 2019, but 
before January 1, 2023, the calendar year in whi ch the member   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 2991 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
reaches seventy-two (72) years of age for an indiv idual who attains 
age seventy and one-half (70 1/2) after December 31, 2019, or 
effective for distributions required to be made after December 31, 
2022, the calendar year in which the member reaches seventy-three 
(73) years of age for an individual who attains age seventy-two (72) 
after December 31, 2022, or "the applicable age", as defined in 
Section 401(a)(9)(C)(v) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as 
amended, if later; or 
2.  The actual retirement date of the member. 
Effective September 8, 2009, notwithst anding anything to t he 
contrary of the System, the System, which is a governmental plan 
(within the meaning of Section 414(d) of the Internal Revenue Code 
of 1986, as amended) is treated as having complied with Section 
401(a)(9) of the Internal Revenue Cod e of 1986, as amende d, for all 
years to which Section 401(a)(9) of the Internal Revenue Code of 
1986, as amended, applies to the System if the System complies with 
a reasonable and good-faith interpretation of Section 401( a)(9) of 
the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended. 
C.  Any member or beneficiary eligible to receive a monthly 
benefit from the System may make an election to waive all or a 
portion of monthly bene fits. 
D.  If the requirements of Section 49-106.5 of this title are 
satisfied, a member who, by reason of at tainment of normal 
retirement date or age, is separated from service as a public safety   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 2991 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
officer with the member's participating municipality, may el ect to 
have payment made directly to the provider for qualified health 
insurance premiums by deduction from his or her monthly pension 
payment, after December 31, 2006, in accordance with Section 402(l) 
of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended. For distributions 
made after December 29, 2022, the elec tion provided for under 
Section 402(l) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, may 
be made whether payment of the premiums is made directly to the 
provider of the accident or health plan or qu alified long-term care 
insurance contract by deduction from a distribution from the Syst em 
or is made to the member. 
SECTION 2.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act sha ll take effect and 
be in full force from and after its p assage and approval. 
Passed the House of Representatives the 6th day of March, 2024. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
 
Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2024. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate