Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2991 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/27/2024

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2991 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
March 26, 2024 
 
 
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 2991 	By: West (Josh) and Munson of 
the House 
 
  and 
 
  Gollihare of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to retirement; amending 11 O.S. 2021, 
Section 49-106, as amended by Section 1, Chapter 151, 
O.S.L. 2023 (11 O.S. Supp. 2023, Section 49 -106), 
which relates to the Oklahoma Firefighters Pension 
and Retirement System; updating reference; directing 
that revisions be taken into account; and declaring 
an emergency. 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF TH E STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     11 O.S. 2021, Section 49 -106, as 
amended by Section 1, Chapter 151, O.S.L. 2023 (11 O.S. Supp. 2023, 
Section 49-106), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 49-106. A.  Any firefighter w ho reaches the 
firefighter's normal retirement date shall be entitled, upon written 
request, to retire from such service and be paid from the Oklahoma 
Firefighters Pension and Retirement System a monthly pension equal 
to the member's accrued retirement ben efit; provided, that the 
pension shall cease during any period of time the member may 
thereafter serve for compensation in any municipal fire department   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2991 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
in the state.  If such a member is reemployed by a participating 
municipality in a position which is no t covered by the System, 
retirement shall also include receipt by such member of in -service 
distributions from the System. 
B.  With respect to distributions under the System made for 
calendar years beginning on or after January 1, 2005, the System 
shall apply the minimum distribution incidental benefit 
requirements, incidental benefit requirements, and minimum 
distribution requirements of Section 401(a)(9) of the Internal 
Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, in accordance with the final 
regulations under Secti on 401(a)(9) of the Internal Revenue Code of 
1986, as amended, including Treasury Regulations Sections 
1.401(a)(9)-1 through 1.401(a)(9) -9; provided, however, that for 
distributions required to be made after December 31 , 2019, for 
individuals who attain se venty and one-half (70 1/2) years of age 
after December 31, 2019, but before January 1, 2023, such 
distributions shall take into account that age 70 1/2 was stricken 
and age 72 was inserted in Section 401(a)(9)(B)(iv)(I), Section 
401(a)(9)(C)(i)(I) and Sec tion 401(a)(9)(C)(ii)(I) of the Internal 
Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, and, provided further, that for 
individuals who attain seventy -two (72) years of age after December 
31, 2022, such distributions shall take into account that "age 72" 
was stricken and "the applicable age", as defined in Section 
401(a)(9)(C)(v) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended,   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2991 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
was inserted in Section 401(a)(9)(B)(iv)(I) of the Internal Revenue 
Code of 1986, as amended (applicable to calendar year 2023) , Section 
401(a)(9)(C)(i)(I) and Section 401(a)(9)(C)(ii)(I) of the Internal 
Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, and that the further revision of 
Section 401(a)(9)(B)(iv) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as 
amended, effective for ca lendar years after 2023 with respect to 
certain distributions shall be taken into account, in all cases 
notwithstanding any provision of the System to the contrary.  With 
respect to distributions under the System made for calendar years 
beginning on or after January 1, 2001, through December 31, 2004, 
the System shall apply the minimum distribution requirements and 
incidental benefit requirements of Section 401(a)(9) of the Internal 
Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, in accordance with the regulations 
under Section 401(a)(9) of the Internal Rev enue Code of 1986, as 
amended, which were proposed in January 2001, notwithstanding any 
provision of the System to the contrary.  Effective July 1, 1989, 
notwithstanding any other provision contained herein to the 
contrary, in no event shall commencement o f distribution of the 
accrued retirement benefit of a member be delayed beyond April 1 of 
the calendar year following the later of: 
1.  The calendar year in which the member reaches seventy and 
one-half (70 1/2) years o f age for a member who attains age se venty 
and one-half (70 1/2) before January 1, 2020, or effective for 
distributions required to be made after December 31, 2019, but   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2991 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
before January 1, 2023, the calendar year in which the member 
reaches seventy-two (72) years of age for an individual who at tains 
age seventy and one-half (70 1/2) after December 31, 2019, or 
effective for distributions required to be made after December 31, 
2022, the calendar year in which the member reaches seventy -three 
(73) years of age for an individual who attains age sev enty-two (72) 
after December 31, 2022, or "the applicable age", as defined in 
Section 401(a)(9)(C)(v) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as 
amended, if later; or 
2.  The actual retirement date of the member. 
Effective September 8, 2009, notwithstanding anything to the 
contrary of the System, the System, which is a governmental plan 
(within the meaning of Section 414(d) of the Internal Revenue Code 
of 1986, as amended) is treated as having complied with Section 
401(a)(9) of the Internal Revenue Code of 19 86, as amended, for all 
years to which Section 401(a)(9) of the Internal Revenue Code of 
1986, as amended, applies to the System if the System complies with 
a reasonable and good -faith interpretation of Section 401(a)(9) of 
the Internal Revenue Code of 198 6, as amended. 
C.  Any member or beneficiary eligible to receive a monthly 
benefit from the System may make an election to waive all or a 
portion of monthly benefits. 
D.  If the requirements of Section 49 -106.5 of this title are 
satisfied, a member who, by reason of attainment of normal   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2991 SFLR 	Page 5 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
retirement date or age, is separated from service as a public safety 
officer with the member 's participating municipality, may elect to 
have payment made directly to the provider for qualified health 
insurance premiums by de duction from his or her monthly pension 
payment, after December 31, 2006, in accordance with Section 402(l) 
of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended.  For distributions 
made after December 29, 2022, the election provided for under 
Section 402(l) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, may 
be made whether payment of the premiums is made directly to the 
provider of the accident or health plan or qualified long -term care 
insurance contract by deduction from a distribution from the System 
or is made to the member. 
SECTION 2.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall tak e effect and 
be in full force from an d after its passage and approval. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON RETIREMENT AND INSURANCE 
March 26, 2024 - DO PASS