Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3828 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/25/2024

                     
 
HB3828 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (20 24) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
HOUSE BILL NO. 3828 	By: Alonso-Sandoval and Pae 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to state government; providing 
definitions; directing the Office of Management and 
Enterprise Services to conduct certain inventory; 
providing required information; directing inventory 
to be made publicly available; directing certain 
ongoing assessments be made of artificial 
intelligence systems; dire cting for development of 
certain policies and procedures; requiring certain 
policies be included; permitting revision of policies 
and procedures; requiring policies and procedures be 
posted; prohibiting the implementation of artific ial 
intelligence without following certain procedures or 
determinations; requiring the Administrative Office 
of the Courts to conduct certain inventory; providing 
for codification; and providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to b e codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 10101 of Title 74, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
As used in this act: 
1.  "Artificial intelligence" means:   
 
HB3828 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
a. an artificial system that: 
(1) performs tasks under varying and unpredictable 
circumstances without significant human oversight 
or can learn from experience and improve such 
performance when exposed to data sets , 
(2) is developed in any context, including, but not 
limited to, software or physical hardware, and 
solves tasks requiring human-like perception, 
cognition, planning, learning, communication or 
physical action, or 
(3) is designed to: 
(a) think or act like a human, i ncluding, but 
not limited to, a cognitive architecture or 
neural network, or 
(b) act rationally, including, but n ot limited 
to, an intelligent software agent or 
embodied robot that achieves goals using 
perception, planning, reasoning, learning, 
communication, decision-making or action, or 
b. a set of techniques, including, but not limited to, 
machine learning, that i s designed to approximate a 
cognitive task; and 
2.  "State agency" means each department, b oard, council, 
commission, institution , or other agency of the executive branch of   
 
HB3828 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
the state government, provided each board, council, commission , 
institution, or other agency included by law within any giv en 
department shall be deemed a divi sion of that department. The term 
"state agency" shall include: 
a. the offices of the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, 
Treasurer, Attorney General, Secretary of State and 
Comptroller, and 
b. all operations of an executive branch agency which are 
funded by either the General Revenue Fund or a special 
fund. 
SECTION 2.     NEW LAW     A new section o f law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Se ction 10102 of Title 74, unless there 
is created a duplica tion in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  Not later than December 31, 2024, and annually thereafter, 
the Office of Management and Enterprise Se rvices (OMES) shall 
conduct an inventory of all systems that employ artifici al 
intelligence and are in use by any state a gency that uses OMES's 
services.  Any agency that does not use OMES's services shall 
conduct their own inventory.  Each such inventory shall include at a 
minimum the following information for each such system: 
1.  The name of such system and the vendor, if any, that 
provided such system; 
2.  A description of the general capabilities and uses of such 
system;   
 
HB3828 HFLR 	Page 4 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
3.  Whether such system was used to independently make, inform, 
or materially support a conclusion, decision, or judgment; and 
4.  Whether such system underwent an impact asses sment prior to 
implementation. 
B.  The Office of Management and Enterprise Serv ices or agencies 
that do not use OMES 's services shall make each inventory conducted 
pursuant to subsection A of this section publicly available on their 
website. 
SECTION 3.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 10103 of Title 74, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follow s: 
A.  Beginning on February 1, 2025, the Office of Management and 
Enterprise Services (OMES) or any agency that does not use OMES's 
services shall perform ongoing assessments of system s that employ 
artificial intelligence and are in us e by state agencies to ensure 
that no such system shall result in any unlawful discrimination or 
disparate impact described in subsection B of this section. 
B.  Not later than February 1, 202 5, the Office of Management 
and Enterprise Services shall develop and establish policies and 
procedures concerning the development, procurement, implement ation, 
utilization, and ongoing assessment of systems that employ 
artificial intelligence and are in use by state ag encies.  Such 
policies and procedures shall, at a m inimum, include poli cies and 
procedures that:   
 
HB3828 HFLR 	Page 5 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
1.  Govern the procurement, implementation , and ongoing 
assessment of such systems by stat e agencies; 
2.  Are sufficient to ensure that no such system : 
a. results in any unlawful discrimination against any 
individual or group of i ndividuals, or 
b. has any unlawful disparate impact on any individual or 
group of individuals on the basis of any actual or 
perceived differentiating characteristics, including, 
but not limited to, age, genetic information, color, 
ethnicity, race, creed, r eligion, national origin, 
ancestry, sex, gender identity or expression, sexual 
orientation, marital status, familial status, 
pregnancy, veteran status, disability, or lawful 
source of income; 
3.  Require a state agency to assess the lik ely impact of any 
such system before implementing such system; and 
4.  Provide for the Office of Management and Enterprise Services 
or any agency that does not use OM ES's services to perform ongoing 
assessments of such systems to ensure that no such system results in 
any unlawful discrimination or disparate impact described in 
paragraph 2 of this subsection. 
C.  The Office of Management and Enterprise Serv ices may revise 
policies and procedures established in this act if such revision is 
deemed necessary by the Executive Director.   
 
HB3828 HFLR 	Page 6 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
D.  The Office of Management and Enterprise Services shall post 
policies and procedures established pursuant to this act and any 
revision made to such policies and procedures pursu ant to subsection 
C on the agency's website. 
E.  Beginning on February 1, 2025, no state agency shall 
implement any system th at employs artificial intelligence: 
1.  Unless the state agency has performed an impact assess ment, 
in accordance with the policies and procedures established pursuant 
to this act, to ensure that such s ystem will not result in any 
unlawful discrimination o r disparate impact described herein; or 
2.  If the head of such state agency determines , at their 
discretion, that such system will result in any unlawful 
discrimination or disparate impact described in this act. 
SECTION 4.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2024. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON GOVERNMENT MODERNIZATION AND 
TECHNOLOGY, dated 02/21/2024 - DO PASS, As Amended and Coauthored.